This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2022 at 07:02:25 (UTC).

MALIMON et al v. T-MOBILE

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 MALIMON filed an Other lawsuit against T-MOBILE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL S. DIAMOND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02287

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kristina Malimon

Yevgeniya Malimon

Defendant

T-MOBILE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE L CASTOR, JR.

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Designation Form

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to T-MOBILE. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/10/22 (JL) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/14/2022. 6/14/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 6/14/2022. 6/14/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to T-MOBILE. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/10/22 (JL) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15974870.), filed by Kristina Malimon, Yevgeniya Malimon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(CASTOR, BRUCE) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less