This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/03/2023 at 07:06:25 (UTC).

MALIK v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2023 MALIK filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against U S DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reggie B. Walton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reggie B. Walton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATTIYA MALIK

Defendants

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION

FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION

MERRICK GARLAND

CHRISTOPHER WRAY

TROY MILLER

ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Malik

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 23, 2023. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (ztth) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#7

(#7) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re Notice of QC- New Case, filed by ATTIYA MALIK. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,.(Malik, Adam) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

6 #16

Summons Summons

6 #15

Summons Summons

6 #13

Summons Summons

6 #12

Summons Summons

6 #11

Summons Summons

6 #10

Summons Summons

6 #8

Summons Summons

6 #7

Summons Summons

6 #6

Summons Summons

6 #5

Summons Summons

6 #4

Summons Summons

6 #3

Summons Summons

6 #2

Summons Summons

6 #1

Summons Summons

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re Notice of QC- New Case, filed by ATTIYA MALIK. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons, #7 Summons Summons, #8 Summons Summons, #9 Summons Summons, #10 Summons Summons, #11 Summons Summons, #12 Summons Summons, #13 Summons Summons, #14 Summons Summons, #15 Summons Summons, #16 Summons Summons)(Malik, Adam) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 23, 2023. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (ztth) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re Notice of QC- New Case, filed by ATTIYA MALIK. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,.(Malik, Adam) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re Notice of QC- New Case, filed by ATTIYA MALIK. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons, #7 Summons Summons, #8 Summons Summons, #9 Summons Summons, #10 Summons Summons, #11 Summons Summons, #12 Summons Summons, #13 Summons Summons, #14 Summons Summons, #15 Summons Summons, #16 Summons Summons)(Malik, Adam) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #4 Request for Summons to Issue; emailed to amalik@malikfirm.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (zsl, ) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, MERRICK GARLAND, ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS, TROY MILLER, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CHRISTOPHER WRAY. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(ztth) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re #1 Complaint, Notice of QC- New Case, filed by ATTIYA MALIK. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by ATTIYA MALIK, Notice of QC- New Case,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons)(Malik, Adam) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to amalik@malikfirm.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue. (znmw, ) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (znmw) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ATTIYA MALIK. Case related to Case No. 22-10772 USCA 5th Circuit. (znmw) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by ATTIYA MALIK re Notice of QC- New Case, filed by ATTIYA MALIK. Related document: Notice of QC- New Case,. (Attachments: #1 Related Case Form)(Malik, Adam) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to amalik@malikfirm.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zcb). (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9760568) filed by ATTIYA MALIK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malik, Adam) (Entered: 01/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less