This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:20:23 (UTC).

Malik et al v. Pompeo et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Malik filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Pompeo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert E. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00380

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kamran Malik

Faryal Kamran

Defendants

Tom Lloyd

Michael Pompeo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Alastair Stevens

Attorney at Murray Osorio PLLC

4103 Chain Bridge Rd, Suite 300

Fairfax, VA 22030

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General, Tom Lloyd, Michael Pompeo all served on 06/12/2019, answer due 08/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Return of Service - Barr, #2 Return of Service - Pompeo, #3 Return of Service - Lloyd) (Stevens, Mark) Modified docket text on 6/21/2019 (smej, ). (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Tom Lloyd, Michael Pompeo, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADERS and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (smej, ) Modified docket text on 6/4/2019 (smej, ). (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Robert E. Payne. (smej, ) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons by Faryal Kamran, Kamran Malik. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons - Att'y Gen., #2 Supplement Summons - Lloyd, #3 Supplement Summons - Pompeo)(Stevens, Mark) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alastair Stevens on behalf of Faryal Kamran, Kamran Malik (Stevens, Mark) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint (Filing Fee: $400, Receipt Number: 0422-6651272), filed by Kamran Malik, Faryal Kamran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Interview Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Visa Status Check, #3 Exhibit 3 - Immigrant Visa Inquiry, #4 Exhibit 4 - Immigrant Visa Inquiry Two, #5 Exhibit 5 - Visa Status Check Two, #6 Exhibit 6 - First Facsimiles to Embassy, #7 Exhibit 7 - Email with LegalNet, #8 Exhibit 8 - Second Facsimiles to Embassy, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Stevens, Mark) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less