This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2022 at 08:48:01 (UTC).

Malick et al v. Croswell-Lexington District Schools et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 Malick filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Croswell-Lexington District Schools. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David M. Lawson and Curtis Ivy, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-11126

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David M. Lawson

Referral Judge

Curtis Ivy, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

April Malick

Rob Malick

CM

Defendants

Croswell-Lexington District Schools

Croswell-Lexington Board of Education

Dan Gilbertson

Kyle Wood

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor

Attorney at Deborah Gordon Law

33 Bloomfield Hills Parway, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Molly Savage

Attorney at Deborah Gordon Law

33 Bloomfield Pkwy, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Sarah Gordon Thomas

Attorney at Deborah Gordon Law

33 Bloomfield Hills Parkway, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Deborah L. Gordon

Attorney at Deborah L. Gordon Assoc.

33 Bloomfield Hills Parkway, Suite 220

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Defendant Attorney

Travis M. Comstock

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W Big Beaver Rd., Suite 1000

Troy, MI 48084

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8921069 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Sanilac - County Where Action Arose: Sanilac - County of 1st Defendant: Sanilac. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Croswell-Lexington Board of Education, Croswell-Lexington District Schools, Dan Gilbertson, Kyle Wood* (SSch) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Gordon Thomas on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thomas, Sarah) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Savage on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Savage, Molly) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Taylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Croswell-Lexington Board of Education served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Croswell-Lexington District Schools served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dan Gilbertson served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kyle Wood served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Croswell-Lexington Board of Education served on 6/7/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Croswell-Lexington District Schools served on 6/7/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Index of Exhibits

12 #2

Exhibit A

12 #3

Exhibit B

12 #4

Exhibit C

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2022 at 2:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2022 at 2:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Comstock, Travis) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Croswell-Lexington District Schools served on 6/7/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Croswell-Lexington Board of Education served on 6/7/2022, answer due 6/28/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kyle Wood served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Dan Gilbertson served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Croswell-Lexington District Schools served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Croswell-Lexington Board of Education served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Marzotto Taylor on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Taylor, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Molly Savage on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Savage, Molly) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Gordon Thomas on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thomas, Sarah) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Croswell-Lexington Board of Education, Croswell-Lexington District Schools, Dan Gilbertson, Kyle Wood* (SSch) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8921069 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Sanilac - County Where Action Arose: Sanilac - County of 1st Defendant: Sanilac. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.M. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Molly Savage