This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:11:28 (UTC).

MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 76.117.121.100

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 MALIBU MEDIA, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 76 117 121 100. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel Schneider and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-09935

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MALIBU MEDIA, LLC

Defendant

JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 76.117.121.100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATRICK JOSEPH CERILLO

4 Walter Foran Blvd., Suite 402

Flemington, NJ 08822

 

Court Documents

4 #9

Text of Proposed Order

4 #8

Certification of Related Cases

4 #7

Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law

4 #6

Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law

4 #5

Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law

4 #4

Brief

4 #3

Exhibit B to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq.

4 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq.

4 #1

Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion

#4

(#4) MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., #4 Brief, #5 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, #6 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law, #7 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law, #8 Certification of Related Cases, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(CERILLO, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#3

(#3) AO121 Copyright Form filed. (ssp, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (CERILLO, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 76.117.121.100 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9582659) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certification of Interested Parties)(CERILLO, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference . Motion set for 5/20/2019 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION For Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Patrick J. Cerillo, Esq., #4 Brief, #5 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law, #6 Exhibit B to Memorandum of Law, #7 Exhibit C to Memorandum of Law, #8 Certification of Related Cases, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(CERILLO, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO121 Copyright Form filed. (ssp, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Judge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (CERILLO, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 76.117.121.100 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9582659) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certification of Interested Parties)(CERILLO, PATRICK) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less