This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 04:36:23 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 03/17/2019 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael S. Nachmanoff and Claude M. Hilton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00309

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael S. Nachmanoff

Presiding Judge

Claude M. Hilton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendants

John Doe

Mark Delos Santos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Carlin Decker, II

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Decker II

5207 Dalby Lane

Burke, VA 22015

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malibu Media, LLC Mark Delos Santos served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons)(Decker, John) Modified on 7/5/2019 by clerk to correct execution date entered in error by filer (acha, ). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

18 #1

Supplement Summons

#17

(#17) Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to: Mark Delos Santos. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

17 #1

Notice to Attorney

#16

(#16) Report on the filing of an action regarding copyright-See Attached(Amended Complaint filed). (acha, )Copy sent to Copyright Office, Washington, DC. (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against Mark Delos Santos, filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#15

(#15) Proposed Summons re #14 Amended Complaint for Damages for Property Rights Infringement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

14 #1

Exhibit

14 #2

Exhibit

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Malibu Media, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 6/17/2019 (See order for further details). (acha, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#12

(#12) Waiver of re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jon Alexander Hoppe. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/20/2019. (acha, ) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543737. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 03/17/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) (Entered: 03/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/19/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malibu Media, LLC Mark Delos Santos served on 7/1/2019, answer due 7/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons)(Decker, John) Modified on 7/5/2019 by clerk to correct execution date entered in error by filer (acha, ). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to: Mark Delos Santos. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Report on the filing of an action regarding copyright-See Attached(Amended Complaint filed). (acha, )Copy sent to Copyright Office, Washington, DC. (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Proposed Summons re #14 Amended Complaint for Damages for Property Rights Infringement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages for Property Rights Infringement against Mark Delos Santos, filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Malibu Media, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 6/17/2019 (See order for further details). (acha, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Waiver of re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jon Alexander Hoppe. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/20/2019. (acha, ) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/19/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Report on the filing of an action regarding copyright- See Attached. (acha, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC re #1 Complaint of the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Decker, John) (Entered: 03/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Waiver of re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John) (Entered: 03/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 03/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) (Entered: 03/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6543737. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 03/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 03/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint for Damages for Property Rights Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6543721.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 03/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less