This case was last updated from PACER on 04/25/2019 at 07:03:46 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 02/24/2019 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael S. Nachmanoff and Liam O'Grady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael S. Nachmanoff

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Carlin Decker, II

Attorney at Law Office of John C. Decker II

5207 Dalby Lane

Burke, VA 22015

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order

1 #2

Exhibit

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 2/25/2019. (see Order for details) (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe, Esquire and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker, Esquire Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6507682. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/26/2019. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit

#4

(#4) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

5 #3

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) Complaint for Damages for Property Rights Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6507670.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

#7

(#7) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright filed by Malibu Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Decker, John) (c/m 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (dvanm, ). (Entered: 02/24/2019)

#6

(#6) Waiver of re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/26/2019. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 2/25/2019. (see Order for details) (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright filed by Malibu Media, LLC (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Decker, John) (c/m 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (dvanm, ). (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Waiver of re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe, Esquire and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker, Esquire Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6507682. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint for Damages for Property Rights Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6507670.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less