This case was last updated from PACER on 09/21/2019 at 07:31:41 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stefan R Underhill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01133

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stefan R Underhill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin T. Conway

Attorney at Kevin T. Conway, Esq.

80 Red Schoolhouse Road, Ste 110

Spring Valley, NY 10977

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Expedite re #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Related Case by Malibu Media, LLC (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

8 #5

Text of Proposed Order

8 #4

Memorandum in Support

8 #3

Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser

8 #2

Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige

8 #1

Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 8/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #4 Memorandum in Support, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

7 #1

Complaint with Exhibits

#7

(#7) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC Signed by Clerk on 7/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2019. Discovery due by 1/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena; denying as moot #10 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 9/12/2019. (Simon, K) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Expedite re #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Related Case by Malibu Media, LLC (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference by Malibu Media, LLC.Responses due by 8/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Colette Pelissier, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Patrick Paige, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #4 Memorandum in Support, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint with Exhibits) (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Malibu Media, LLC, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Malibu Media, LLC Signed by Clerk on 7/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 7/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/21/2019. Discovery due by 1/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5371030.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.