This case was last updated from PACER on 08/31/2019 at 07:40:00 (UTC).

Malibu Media LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Malibu Media LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sam A Lindsay and Barbara M. G. Lynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01598

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sam A Lindsay

Barbara M. G. Lynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Stephen Beik

Attorney at Beik Law Firm PLLC

8100 Washington Avenue, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Discovery filed by Malibu Media LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix - Exhibits A-C, #2 Proposed Order) (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Malibu Media LLC. (Beik, Paul) Modified title on 7/3/2019 (mla). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

#8

(#8) MOTION to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Malibu Media LLC. (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/13/2019) (epm) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against John Doe filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10091488) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet) (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#5

(#5) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (epm) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/3/2019) (mla). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit(s) Appendix - Exhibits A-C

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Malibu Media LLC. (Beik, Paul) Modified title on 7/3/2019 (mla). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/3/2019) (epm) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Discovery. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/17/2019) (mla) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 8/13/2019) (epm) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Discovery. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 7/17/2019) (mla) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Malibu Media LLC. (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Discovery filed by Malibu Media LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Appendix - Exhibits A-C, #2 Proposed Order) (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn for all further proceedings. Judge Sam A Lindsay no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 7/3/2019) (epm) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (epm) (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/3/2019) (mla). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (epm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Malibu Media LLC. (Beik, Paul) Modified title on 7/3/2019 (mla). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Malibu Media LLC. (Beik, Paul) Modified title on 7/3/2019 (mla). (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against John Doe filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10091488) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet) (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.