This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:36:02 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00632

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Stephen Beik

Attorney at Beik Law Firm, P.L.L.C.

8100 Washington Avenue, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77007

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION for Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Beik, Paul) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12205163). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beik, Paul) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#4

(#4) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (mgr) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Discovery Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Cases by Malibu Media, LLC (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Malibu Media, LLC. (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

5 #2

Proposed Order

1 #1

Exhibit A

5 #1

Appendix

1 #2

Exhibit B

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Discovery Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Related Cases by Malibu Media, LLC (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Beik, Paul) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (mgr) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Farrer (mgr) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (mgr) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Parties by Malibu Media, LLC. (Beik, Paul) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12205163). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beik, Paul) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.