This case was last updated from PACER on 07/04/2019 at 13:00:23 (UTC).

Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 Malibu Media, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-03925

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malibu Media, LLC

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin T. Conway

Attorney at Kevin T. Conway, Esq.

80 Red Schoolhouse Road, Ste 110

Spring Valley, NY 10977

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Exhibit

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

(#6) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena on Defendant's ISP addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Kevin T. Conway, Esq. dated May 22, 2019. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#10

(#10) DECLARATION of Colette Pelissier in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference re: #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/25/2019)

#11

(#11) DECLARATION of Tobias Fieser in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference re: #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/25/2019)

#3

(#3) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#5

(#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE granting #8 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 8). FIND, ORDER AND ADJUDGE:Plaintiff may serve the ISP with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth on Exhibit A to the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Order as further set forth in this order. ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/29/2019) (rj) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16805219)Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#4

(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference re: #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document . . Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/25/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The application is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 6). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/23/2019) (ks) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#12

(#12) DECLARATION of Patrick Paige in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference re: #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/26/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference re: #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document . Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/25/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE granting #8 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 8). FIND, ORDER AND ADJUDGE:Plaintiff may serve the ISP with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth on Exhibit A to the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Order as further set forth in this order. ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/29/2019) (rj) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DECLARATION of Patrick Paige in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference re: #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DECLARATION of Tobias Fieser in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference re: #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DECLARATION of Colette Pelissier in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference re: #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference re: #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document . . Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference re: #7 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document . Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The application is granted. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 6). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 5/23/2019) (ks) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena on Defendant's ISP addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Kevin T. Conway, Esq. dated May 22, 2019. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jgo) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin T. Conway. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kevin T. Conway. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code Foley Square;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains;. (jgo) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16805219)Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Conway, Kevin) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.