This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2019 at 07:03:32 (UTC).

Malhotra v. Sonim Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 Malhotra filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Sonim Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maxine M. Chesney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-06416

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maxine M. Chesney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ajay Malhotra

Defendants

National Securities Corporation

Alan Howe

Robert Plaschke

Kenny Young

John Kneuer

Maurice Hochschild

Jeffrey D. Johnson

Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.

Lake Street Capital Markets, LLC

Susan G. Swenson

Sonim Technologies, Inc.

James Walker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lesley F. Portnoy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Robert Vincent Prongay

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Charles Henry Linehan

Attorney at Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Pavithra Rajesh

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lionel Z. Glancy

Attorney at Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

1925 Century Park East, Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2722

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#7

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ajay Malhotra. Service waived by Maurice Hochschild waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Alan Howe waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Jeffrey D. Johnson waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; John Kneuer waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Robert Plaschke waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Sonim Technologies, Inc. waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Susan G. Swenson waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; James Walker waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019; Kenny Young waiver sent on 10/24/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 10/31/2019) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE by Ajay Malhotra of Publication of SEC Class Action Notice (Rajesh, Pavithra) (Filed on 10/28/2019) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Lesley F. Portnoy on behalf of Ajay Malhotra (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ajay Malhotra (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Issued as to Oppenheimer & Co. Inc. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to National Securities Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Lake Street Capital Markets, LLC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Maurice Hochschild, Alan Howe, Jeffrey D. Johnson, John Kneuer, Robert Plaschke, Sonim Technologies, Inc., Susan G. Swenson, James Walker, Kenny Young. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2020 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • (#6) Case assigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13771956.). Filed byAjay Malhotra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Portnoy, Lesley) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lake Street Capital Markets, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Oppenheimer & Co. Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where National Securities Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sonim Technologies, Inc. is a litigant