This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 10:24:04 (UTC).

Malgo, Inc. et al v. PureHD, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 Malgo, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PureHD, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-40055

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Goldstein

Malgo, Inc.

Defendant

PureHD, LLC

Interested Parties

PureHD, Inc.

Solutioninc, Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard S. Ravosa, Jr.

Interested Party and Defendant Attorney

Gary M Ronan

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#12

#13

#14

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Affidavit of Andrew MacDougall). (Ronan, Gary) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PureHD, Inc., PureHD, LLC, Solutioninc, Limited. (Ronan, Gary) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by PureHD, Inc., PureHD, LLC, Solutioninc, Limited.(Ronan, Gary) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. PureHD, LLC answer due 7/10/2020. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 10, 2020 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PureHD, Inc., PureHD, LLC, Solutioninc, Limited.(Ronan, Gary) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary M Ronan on behalf of PureHD, Inc., PureHD, LLC, Solutioninc, Limited (Ronan, Gary) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed PureHD, LLC served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Ravosa, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re #1 Complaint, by Michael Goldstein, Malgo, Inc.. (Ravosa, Richard) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to PureHD, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from Central Division (Worcester) on 5/15/2020 Case Number 4:20-cv-40055. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred to Eastern Division (Boston). (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Counsel omitted the civil category form when he filed his complaint. Counsel should now file the document using the event "civil cover and category form" under the other documents menu. (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8241722 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Michael Goldstein, Malgo, Inc..(Ravosa, Richard) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/15/2020) (Jones, Sherry). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Jones, Sherry). (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less