This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 10:59:57 (UTC).

Malek v. ACS New York City et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 Malek filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ACS New York City. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip M. Halpern, Alison J. Nathan and Ona T. Wang. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06381

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ona T. Wang

Presiding Judges

Philip M. Halpern

Alison J. Nathan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Malek

Brooklyn, NY 11235

Defendants

ACS New York City

Jaqueline Williams

Legal Aid Society

Sun River Health/ Brightpoint Health

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#5

#6

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Supplement

7 #2

Supplement

7 #3

Supplement

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Robert M. Malek consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Robert Malek.(sc) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #10 Order, to Robert Malek at 2609 East 14th Street, #304, Brooklyn, NY 11235. (dsh) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re: #7 Request to Reinstate Pusuant to 60 B (6) filed by Robert Malek, #8 Pausing Request to Reinstate Pending Criminal Investigation & Ongoing Health Issues filed by Robert Malek. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motions to reopen and "pause" this action, Dkt. Nos. 7-8, are denied. This action, which was dismissed without prejudice to Plaintiff's refiling it, remains closed. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/31/2021) (vfr) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ADDITIONAL REMARKS UPON CASES 21CV5532 & 21CV6381. Document filed by Robert Malek. (sc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAUSING REQUEST TO REINSTATE PENDING CRIMINAL INVESTIGATION & ONGOING HEALTH ISSUES. Document filed by Robert Malek. (sc) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST TO REINSTATE PURSUANT TO 60 B (6). Document filed by Robert Malek. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement) (ok) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL: I, ROBERT MALEK, DECLARE UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY UNDER THE LAWS OF THEUNITED STATES OF AMERICA THAT UPON MY INQUIRY TO WHITE PLAINS FEDERALCOURT TODAY, I FOUND OUT THAT THIS CASE ABOVE, 21 CV 6381 WAS TRANSFERRED TO THEMANHATTAN COURTHOUSE WITHOUT MY KNOWLEDGE JUST LIKE 21 CV 5532. I WISH TOVOLUNTARILY DISMISS THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE ACCORDING TO FEDERALRULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(A)(1). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/9/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Alison J. Nathan for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal in a Pro Se case. (km) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Robert Malek. Document filed by Robert Malek. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). (sc) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (Notice) INTENT TO PROCEED IN WHITE PLAINS ONLY. Document filed by Robert Malek. (sc) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/5/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-05532-AJN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMailed Notice of Assignment/Reassignment Robert Malek 2609 East 14th Street #304 Brooklyn, NY 11235. (vba) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Philip M. Halpern is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to ACS New York City, Legal Aid Society, Sun River Health/ Brightpoint Health, Jaqueline Williams..(rdz) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC) is a litigant