This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 20:23:31 (UTC).

Malec v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2019 Malec filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Guaranteed Rate, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03966

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Malec

Defendants

Guaranteed Rate, Inc.

Joseph Phelan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James B. Zouras

Attorney at Stephan Zouras, LLP

100 North Riverside Plaza, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

Haley Renee Jenkins

Attorney at Stephan Zouras, Llp

100 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2150

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Michael H. Cramer

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

155 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael Vincent Furlong

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

155 North Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael D. Ray

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

201 S. College Street, Suite 2300

Charlotte, NC 28244

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Named Plaintiff, Matthew Malec, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, by and through his undersigned counsel, voluntarily dismiss his class and collective claims, without prejudice, as to Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc. and Joseph Phelan, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (l)(A)(i), with Plaintiffs and Defendants bearing responsibility for their own attorneys' fees and costs. Defendants have not yet filed an answer or motion for summary judgment in this case. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 8/16/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, ) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint #9 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, July 12, 2019. An Agreed Written Status Report is due on 9/11/2019. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Malec by Haley Renee Jenkins (Jenkins, Haley) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Motion by Michael Vincent Furlong for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/12/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION by Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Joseph Phelan for extension of time to file answer - DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Joseph Phelan by Michael Vincent Furlong (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Joseph Phelan by Michael D. Ray (Ray, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Joseph Phelan by Michael H. Cramer (Cramer, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Malec as to Joseph Phelan on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Zouras, James) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Malec as to Guaranteed Rate, Inc. on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Zouras, James) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Guaranteed Rate, Inc., Joseph Phelan (daj, ) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matthew Malec by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zouras, James) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Malec; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15925659. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zouras, James) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Guaranteed Rate, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Haley Renee Jenkins

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James B. Zouras