This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 09:51:44 (UTC).

Maldonado v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 Maldonado filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01255

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Theresa Maldonado

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions Inc

Equifax Information Services LLC

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shawn Jaffer

Attorney at Shawn Jaffer Law Firm PLLC

13601 Preston Rd Suite E770

Dallas, TX 75240

Matthew P Forsberg

Attorney at Fields Law Firm

9999 Wayzata Blvd

Minnetonka, MN 55305

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas R Cushing

Attorney at Jones Day

2727 N Harwood St

Dallas, TX 75201

Forrest Mathew Seger, III

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

2301 Broadway

San Antonio, TX 78215

Sarah Nichols Wariner

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

2600 Dallas Parkway, Suite 600

Frisco, TX 75034

Anna K Olin

Attorney at Clark Hill Strasburger

901 Main Street, Suite 6000

Dallas, TX 75202

Lishel May Bautista

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2200 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Tatiana Alexander

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

2000 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1400

Dallas, TX 75201

Charlotte A Long

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett Moser PC

6900 N Dallas Pkwy, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Court Request for Recusal: The referral judge for this case has been reassigned via random assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. U.S. Magistrate Judge David L. Horan is no longer assigned to the case. (cea) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#17

(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Cushing, Thomas) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Thomas R Cushing added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc (pty:dft). (Cushing, Thomas) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union LLC. (Long, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Trans Union LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Charlotte A Long added to party Trans Union LLC (pty:dft). (Long, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 8/6/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/19/2020) (axm) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate NSM Holdings for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Alexander, Tatiana) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Tatiana Alexander added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:dft) (Alexander, Tatiana) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Olin, Anna) (Main Document 10 replaced to flatten image on 6/18/2020) (dsr). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLC Attorney Anna K Olin added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft) (Olin, Anna) Enhanced text on 6/18/2020 (dsr). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions Inc ; served on 6/1/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit(s) E

1 #5

Exhibit(s) D

1 #4

Exhibit(s) C

1 #3

Exhibit(s) B

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Theresa Maldonado. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10836537) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E) (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Court Request for Recusal: The referral judge for this case has been reassigned via random assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. U.S. Magistrate Judge David L. Horan is no longer assigned to the case. (cea) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions Inc. (Cushing, Thomas) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Thomas R Cushing added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc (pty:dft). (Cushing, Thomas) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate TransUnion for Trans Union LLC. (Long, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Trans Union LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Charlotte A Long added to party Trans Union LLC (pty:dft). (Long, Charlotte) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 8/6/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/19/2020) (axm) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate NSM Holdings for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Alexander, Tatiana) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Tatiana Alexander added to party Nationstar Mortgage LLC(pty:dft) (Alexander, Tatiana) (Entered: 06/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Olin, Anna) (Main Document 10 replaced to flatten image on 6/18/2020) (dsr). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLC Attorney Anna K Olin added to party Equifax Information Services LLC(pty:dft) (Olin, Anna) Enhanced text on 6/18/2020 (dsr). (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Experian Information Solutions Inc ; served on 6/1/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Trans Union LLC ; served on 6/1/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC ; served on 6/1/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC ; served on 6/1/2020. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Trans Union LLC. (svc) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Theresa Maldonado. (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Theresa Maldonado. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10836537) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E) (Forsberg, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant