This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 09:49:02 (UTC).

Maldonado v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Maldonado filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David A. Ruiz and Dan Aaron Polster. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01878

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David A. Ruiz

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica Maldonado

Youngstown, OH 44505

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa Hammond Johnson

Attorney at Office of the U.S. Attorney - Cleveland

801 Superior Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Social Security Administration - Chicago

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/20/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

9 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#9

(#9) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security (c/o U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,CA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#8

(#8) Order granting #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/20/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

7 #1

USM-285

#7

(#7) Supplement (Summons) to #1 Complaint, filed by Veronica Maldonado. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(S,Ke) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

2 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Veronica Maldonado. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Motion to proceed in forma pauperis)(M,R) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #12

*Restricted*

1 #9

*Restricted*

1 #8

*Restricted*

1 #7

Redacted Envelope

1 #6

Redacted Accusose Pharmacy

1 #5

Redacted Letter from PsyCare

1 #4

redacted Letter from Veronica Maldonado

1 #3

Redacted USM 285

1 #2

Redacted Summons

#1

(#1) Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP... Filed by Veronica Maldonado. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Redacted Summons, #3 Redacted USM 285, #4 redacted Letter from Veronica Maldonado, #5 Redacted Letter from PsyCare, #6 Redacted Accusose Pharmacy, #7 Redacted Envelope, #8 Unredacted Complaint, #9 Unredacted Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Unredacted Summons, #11 Unredacted USM 285, #12 Unredacted Letter from Veronica Maldonado, #13 Unredacted Letter from PsyCare, #14 Unredacted Accusose Pharmacy, #15 Unredacted Envelope) (M,R) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #8 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #9 Summons Issued, #10 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order mailed to Veronica Maldonado,1825 Kimmel Street, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 10/20/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/20/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security (c/o U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel). (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (G,CA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order granting #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/20/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Supplement (Summons) to #1 Complaint, filed by Veronica Maldonado. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(S,Ke) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #6 Order, U.S. Marshal forms and summonses mailed to Veronica Maldonado, 1825 Kimmel Street, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 9/16/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order. The Plaintiff did not comply with the deficiency order #4 . On September 14, 2020, Plaintiff provided a Marshal form and summons only for the Commissioner of Social Security at an incorrect location. Given the Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court will allow the Plaintiff one more opportunity to provide the proper service forms. Plaintiff is allowed 30 days from the date of this order to provide necessary U.S. Marshal forms and summonses for all of the parties requiring service of process (i.e., the Commissioner of Social Security, the U.S. Attorney General, and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio). Clerk's Office is directed to send sufficient U.S. Marshal forms and summonses to the Plaintiff with a copy of the order. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 9/16/2020. Related document #5 . (G,CA) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Supplement (Summons) to #1 Complaint, filed by Veronica Maldonado. Related document(s) #4 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons Unredacted, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285 Unredacted)(S,Ke) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of #4 Order, U.S. Marshal forms and summonses mailed to Veronica Maldonado, 1825 Kimmel Street, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 8/26/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order. Plaintiff to provide completed U.S. Marshal forms and Summonses for the parties requiring service (i.e., the Commissioner of Social Security, the U.S. Attorney General, and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of Ohio) within thirty (30) days of this order. Clerk's Office is directed to send sufficient U.S. Marshal forms and summonses to the Plaintiff with a copy of the order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of this case without further notice. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 8/26/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCopy of Automatic Reference of Administrative Action mailed to Veronica Maldonado at 1825 Kimmel Street, Youngstown, OH 44505 on 8/25/2020. (K,K) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketAutomatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/25/2020. (K,K) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (M,R) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Veronica Maldonado. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Motion to proceed in forma pauperis)(M,R) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (M,R) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketJudge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (M,R) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP... Filed by Veronica Maldonado. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Redacted Summons, #3 Redacted USM 285, #4 redacted Letter from Veronica Maldonado, #5 Redacted Letter from PsyCare, #6 Redacted Accusose Pharmacy, #7 Redacted Envelope, #8 Unredacted Complaint, #9 Unredacted Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Unredacted Summons, #11 Unredacted USM 285, #12 Unredacted Letter from Veronica Maldonado, #13 Unredacted Letter from PsyCare, #14 Unredacted Accusose Pharmacy, #15 Unredacted Envelope) (M,R) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less