This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2020 at 12:35:16 (UTC).

Maldonado et al v. Hadzikadunic et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Maldonado filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Hadzikadunic. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg N. Stivers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00151

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg N. Stivers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Lugo Mason

Bowling Green, KY 42101

Alexander Maldonado, Jr.

Bowling Green, KY 42101

Defendants

Evan Cook

Curtis Hargett

Warren County Sheriff's Office

Robert Smith

Vedad Hadzikadunic

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #1

Summons

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

envelope

#3

#2

1 #2

envelope

1 #1

Summons (incomplete)

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE regarding Prison Trust Account Statement by Alexander Maldonado, Jr. re #9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement, #7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (CDF) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Response to #5 Notice of Deficiency filed by David Lugo Mason. (*IFP motion has been received and filed separately; Prison Trust account statement has been received and filed seaprately; Signature page of the complaint has been received and attached to #1 by the Clerk) (JM) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by David Lugo Mason (JM) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Lugo Mason (JM) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alexander Maldonado, Jr. (JM) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Response to #4 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Alexander Maldonado, Jr.. (Summons have been tendered and attached to DN #1 . Trust account statement has been provided and docketed separately.) (Attachments: #1 Summons) (JM) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Plaintiff Mason's Failure to sign and failure to either pay filing fee or submit application to proceed without prepayment of fees. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/30/2020. (CDF) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint, #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Reason for Deficiency: Failure to file prison trust account statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/30/2020. (CDF) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Alexander Maldonado, Jr. (CDF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2020: #1 envelope) (CDF). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Vedad Hadzikadunic, Curtis Hargett, Robert Smith, Evan Cook, Warren County Sheriff's Office, filed by Alexander Maldonado, Jr., David Lugo Mason. (Attachments: #1 Summons (incomplete), #2 envelope) (CDF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #3 Summons Tendered to the Court 9/9/2020) (JM). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2020: #4 Complaint signed by Plaintiff Mason (tendered on 9/11/2020)) (JM). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Warren County Sheriff's Office is a litigant