This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2021 at 08:01:28 (UTC).

Malara v. Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Malara filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are David C Norton and Mary Gordon Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01432

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Norton

Referral Judge

Mary Gordon Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Malara

Defendant

Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC d/b/a AMR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonnie Travaglio Hunt

Attorney at Hunt Law

Po Box 1845

Goose Creek, SC 29445

Defendant Attorneys

Allison Hawkins

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC (GRE)

15 South Main Street, Suite 700

Greenville, SC 29601

Thomas Chase Samples

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC (GRE)

15 South Main Street, Suite 700

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by David Malara.(Hunt, Bonnie) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

#7

(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/2/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/16/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 7/16/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/6/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/7/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/7/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/7/2021, Discovery due by 12/6/2021, Motions due by 2/4/2022, Mediation Due by 1/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 06/11/2021. (hcor, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC. (Samples, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Malara.(Hunt, Bonnie) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

#4

(#4) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC answer due 6/10/2021. (Samples, Thomas) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC.(hcor, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berkeley County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021CP0800741. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9843264), filed by Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(hcor, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by David Malara.(Hunt, Bonnie) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/2/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/16/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 7/16/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/6/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/7/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/7/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/7/2021, Discovery due by 12/6/2021, Motions due by 2/4/2022, Mediation Due by 1/5/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 06/11/2021. (hcor, ) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC. (Samples, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Malara.(Hunt, Bonnie) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC answer due 6/10/2021. (Samples, Thomas) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC.(hcor, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Berkeley County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021CP0800741. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9843264), filed by Lifeguard Ambulance Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(hcor, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lifeguard Ambulance Service LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Chase Samples