This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2019 at 07:10:19 (UTC).

Brad Malamud et al v. City of San Clemente et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Brad Malamud filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of San Clemente. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00855

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chanel Fetty

Anthony Rubolino

Brad Malamud

Defendants

Steven Swartz

City of San Clemente

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Richard Michael

Krista L Baughman

Harmeet K Dhillon

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER CONTINUING CASE DEADLINES AND RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE #14 by Judge James V. Selna. PURSUANT TO STIPULATION, THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: The Scheduling Conference is continued to November 4, 2019 at 10:30 a.m.; Defendant City of San Clemente's deadline to file a response to the Verified Complaint shall be continued to October 1, 2019; Plaintiffs' deadline to amend their Complaint once as a matter of course, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a), shall be October 15, 2019; Plaintiffs' deadline to serve Defendant Mayor of City of San Clemente in his official capacity shall be continued to November 4, 2019. (See document for further details) (es) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Order #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION for Order CONTINUING CASE DEADLINES AND RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by plaintiff Chanel Fetty, Brad Malamud, Anthony Rubolino.(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chanel Fetty, Brad Malamud, Anthony Rubolino, upon Defendant City of San Clemente served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joanne Baade, City Clerk of San Clement in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error item docket 10 and 11 were docketed in the wrong case. These items have been docketed in the correct case of 8:19-cv-00955-PSG-RAOx. Notice of Assignment (CV-18) form #10 and Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) form #11 should be disregarded. (car) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/22/2019. (lb) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV 19-00855-JVS (ADSx). (dv) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 4 Civil Cover Sheet should have been e-filed separately and in the correct event category. The event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants City of San Clemente, Steven Swartz(individual ), Steven Swartz(in his official capacities as Mayor of the City of San Clemente). (car) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Chanel Fetty, Brad Malamud, Anthony Rubolino. (Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23695296 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chanel Fetty, Brad Malamud, Anthony Rubolino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Chanel Fetty(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Brad Malamud(pty:pla), Attorney Harmeet K Dhillon added to party Anthony Rubolino(pty:pla))(Dhillon, Harmeet) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less