This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2021 at 09:27:31 (UTC).

MAKOWKA v. PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 MAKOWKA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is ANITA B. BRODY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00990

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANITA B. BRODY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KATHLEEN MAKOWKA

Defendant

PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN NEUMANN HICKEY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN N. HICKEY

20 W. Front St

Media, PA 19063

Defendant Attorneys

NATHAN R. BOHLANDER

Attorney at Morgan & Akins, PLLC

The Graham Building, Suite 701, 30 S. 15Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

PATRICIA BAXTER

Attorney at MORGAN & AKINS, PLLC

The Graham Building, Suite 701, 30 S. 15Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STIPULATION Confidentiality Agreement for Materials Produced by All Parties by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC.. (BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW FROM AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS FOR LOSS OF EARNINGS AND EARNING CAP A CITY WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 4/19/21. 4/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

10 #2

Certificate of Service

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#10

(#10) RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff, Kathleen Makowka's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Reply in Support of Defendant, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff, Kathleen Makowka's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff, Kathleen Makowka's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by KATHLEEN MAKOWKA. (HICKEY, JOHN) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 3/23/21.3/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#7

(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff, Kathleen Makowka's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 5/26/2021 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC., filed by KATHLEEN MAKOWKA.(HICKEY, JOHN) Modified on 4/19/2021 (lvj, ). (STRICKEN PER ORDER #11) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#3

(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff, Kathleen Makowka's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC..(BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14951147), filed by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC..(BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Confidentiality Agreement for Materials Produced by All Parties by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC.. (BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW FROM AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS FOR LOSS OF EARNINGS AND EARNING CAP A CITY WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 4/19/21. 4/19/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff, Kathleen Makowka's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) Reply in Support of Defendant, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff, Kathleen Makowka's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff, Kathleen Makowka's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by KATHLEEN MAKOWKA. (HICKEY, JOHN) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 3/23/21.3/23/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff, Kathleen Makowka's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 5/26/2021 AT 10:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC., filed by KATHLEEN MAKOWKA.(HICKEY, JOHN) Modified on 4/19/2021 (lvj, ). (STRICKEN PER ORDER #11) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docket(#4) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (JL ) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant, Primeflight Aviation Services, Inc's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff, Kathleen Makowka's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase Eligible for Arbitration(lvj, ) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC..(BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14951147), filed by PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES, INC..(BOHLANDER, NATHAN) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIMEFLIGHT AVIATION SERVICES INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN NEUMANN HICKEY(Designation Retained)