This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:34:16 (UTC).

Mako Resources, L.L.C. et al v. Trinity Operating (USG), LLC

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Mako Resources, L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Trinity Operating USG , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory K Frizzell and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00461

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory K Frizzell

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mako Resources, L.L.C.

Staab Holdings, L.L.C.

TMN Resources, LLC

Golden Gas Service Company

Alan R Staab

Defendants

Trinity Operating (USG), LLC

WSGP Gas Producing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roger K Eldredge

Attorney at Ladner & Eldredge PLLC

320 S Boston Ave Ste 1026

Tulsa, OK 74103-3703

Thomas M Ladner

Attorney at Ladner & Eldredge PLLC

320 S Boston Ave Ste 1026

Tulsa, OK 74103-3703

Defendant Attorneys

J Kevin Hayes

Attorney at Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (Tulsa)

320 S Boston Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74103-3706

Michele R Blythe

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

600 Travis St Ste 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Pamela S Anderson

Attorney at Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (Tulsa)

320 S Boston Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74103-3706

Michael D Morfey

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

600 Travis St Ste 4200

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D Morfey on behalf of WSGP Gas Producing, LLC [Note: Attorney Michael D Morfey added to party WSGP Gas Producing, LLC(pty:dft).] (Morfey, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#26

(#26) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent USG Energy Gas Producers Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Resources, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent NextEra Energy, Inc. for WSGP Gas Producing, LLC) by WSGP Gas Producing, LLC (Blythe, Michele) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#25

(#25) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by WSGP Gas Producing, LLC (Blythe, Michele) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#24

(#24) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michele R Blythe on behalf of WSGP Gas Producing, LLC [Note: Attorney Michele R Blythe added to party WSGP Gas Producing, LLC(pty:dft).] (Blythe, Michele) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#23

(#23) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Blythe, Michele) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set 10/15/2019) ; granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re #16 Amended Complaint) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

16 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

16 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#16

(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #16 Amended Complaint ) by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Blythe, Michele) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mako Resources, L.L.C. (Ladner, Thomas) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J Kevin Hayes on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Hayes, J) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pamela S Anderson on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Anderson, Pamela) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#3

(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Anderson, Pamela) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Docket Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Entry of Appearance

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-02936 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2098836) by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (With attachments) (Anderson, Pamela) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Anderson, Pamela) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • (#28) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing WSGP Gas Producing, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D Morfey on behalf of WSGP Gas Producing, LLC [Note: Attorney Michael D Morfey added to party WSGP Gas Producing, LLC(pty:dft).] (Morfey, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent USG Energy Gas Producers Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Marketing, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Resources, LLC, Corporate Parent NextEra Energy Capital Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent NextEra Energy, Inc. for WSGP Gas Producing, LLC) by WSGP Gas Producing, LLC (Blythe, Michele) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by WSGP Gas Producing, LLC (Blythe, Michele) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michele R Blythe on behalf of WSGP Gas Producing, LLC [Note: Attorney Michele R Blythe added to party WSGP Gas Producing, LLC(pty:dft).] (Blythe, Michele) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Blythe, Michele) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • (#22) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Golden Gas Service Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell (Deadline set 10/15/2019) ; granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re #16 Amended Complaint) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #16 Amended Complaint ) by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Blythe, Michele) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Golden Gas Service Company (Ladner, Thomas) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Staab Holdings, L.L.C. (Ladner, Thomas) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mako Resources, L.L.C. (Ladner, Thomas) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Mako Resources, L.L.C, TMN Resources, LLC and Staab Holdings, L.L.C to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Trinity Operating (USG), LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J Kevin Hayes on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Hayes, J) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Pamela S Anderson on behalf of Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Anderson, Pamela) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Anderson, Pamela) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2019-02936 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2098836) by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (With attachments) (Anderson, Pamela) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Trinity Operating (USG), LLC (Anderson, Pamela) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by TMN Resources, LLC, Mako Resources, L.L.C., Staab Holdings, L.L.C. (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.