This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:44:54 (UTC).

Majors v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Majors filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher P. Tuite and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02934

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynelle Majors

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bartholomew Charles Zadel

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

988 Woodcock Rd.

Orlando, FL 32803

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

5 #2

Main Document

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Main Document)(WCD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2019: #1 Main Document, #2 Main Document) (WCD). Modified on 12/2/2019 (WCD). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#7

(#7) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/18/2019. (APV) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

5 #1

Main Document

#8

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 12/2/2019. (AHA) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lynelle Majors. Related case(s): yes (Zadel, Bartholomew) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/18/2019. (APV) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • (#6) ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/10. (WCD) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Main Document, #2 Main Document)(WCD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2019: #1 Main Document, #2 Main Document) (WCD). Modified on 12/2/2019 (WCD). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 12/2/2019. (AHA) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-2934-T-35CPT. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (SJB) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lynelle Majors. (Zadel, Bartholomew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Lynelle Majors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Attorney General, #4 Proposed Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #5 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney for the Middle District of Florida)(Zadel, Bartholomew) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.