This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2021 at 12:30:59 (UTC).

Major v. Graphic Solutions Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Major filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Graphic Solutions Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. deGravelles and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00216

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Monette Major

Defendant

Graphic Solutions Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jill L Craft

Attorney at Jill L. Craft Attorney at Law

329 St. Ferdinand Street, 70802

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Kaitlin Aubrey Wall

Attorney at Jill L. Craft, Attorney at Law, LLC

329 St. Ferdinand Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

William Brett Conrad, Jr.

Attorney at Jill L. Craft, LLC, Attorney at Law

330 Government Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Defendant Attorneys

Scott D. Huffstetler

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP

P. O. Box 3513, 400 Convention Street, Suite 700

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Chelsea Gomez Caswell

Attorney at Kean Miller LLP

400 Convention Street, P.O. Box 3513

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2021. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 7/1/2021. Discovery due by 1/7/2022. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 9/3/2021. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 11/5/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 10/1/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 12/3/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 2/4/2022. Dispositive and Daubert Motions shall be filed by 3/4/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/24/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 7/22/2022. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 8/5/2022. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 7/26/2023. Four day Jury Trial set for 8/14/2023 - 8/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/25/2021. (EDC) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#10

(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Monette Major. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER and Defenses to #8 Supplemental, Amending and Restated COMPLAINT by Graphic Solutions Group, Inc. (Huffstetler, Scott) Modified on 5/14/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#8

(#8) Supplemental, Amending and Restated COMPLAINT against Graphic Solutions Group, Inc., filed by Monette Major.(LLH) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

6 #3

Exhibit Proposed Exhibit

6 #2

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint

6 #1

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint by Monette Major. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint, #3 Exhibit Proposed Exhibit)(Conrad, William) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2021 at 11:30 AM in chambers. Status Report due by 5/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/19/2021. (SWE) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Graphic Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Graphic Solutions Group, Inc.. (Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Parish of East Baton Rouge, State of Louisiana, Case Number 705606. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2274595), filed by Graphic Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/25/2021. (EDC) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2021. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 7/1/2021. Discovery due by 1/7/2022. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 9/3/2021. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 11/5/2021. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 10/1/2021. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 12/3/2021. Discovery from Experts due by 2/4/2022. Dispositive and Daubert Motions shall be filed by 3/4/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/24/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2022 at 03:00 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 7/22/2022. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 8/5/2022. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 7/26/2023. Four day Jury Trial set for 8/14/2023 - 8/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/25/2021. (EDC) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2021 is CANCELED. The court will issue a separate scheduling order in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/24/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT by Monette Major. (Craft, Jill) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and Defenses to #8 Supplemental, Amending and Restated COMPLAINT by Graphic Solutions Group, Inc. (Huffstetler, Scott) Modified on 5/14/2021 to edit the docket text (KMW). (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Supplemental, Amending and Restated COMPLAINT against Graphic Solutions Group, Inc., filed by Monette Major.(LLH) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Monette Major. The Clerk of Court is instructed to docket the [6-2] Supplemental, Amending and Restated Complaint, which shall become Plaintiff's operative complaint in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/28/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint by Monette Major. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Supplemental, Amending, and Restated Complaint, #3 Exhibit Proposed Exhibit)(Conrad, William) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Plead pursuant to Local Rule 7(a). Graphic Solutions Group, Inc. responsive pleading due 5/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/20/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2021 at 11:30 AM in chambers. Status Report due by 5/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/19/2021. (SWE) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Graphic Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Graphic Solutions Group, Inc.. (Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Parish of East Baton Rouge, State of Louisiana, Case Number 705606. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2274595), filed by Graphic Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huffstetler, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Deloss Huffstetler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chelsea Gomez Caswell