This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2021 at 11:25:23 (UTC).

Major Mike Webb v. Fauci et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Major Mike Webb filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Fauci. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is M. Hannah Lauck. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00432

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. Hannah Lauck

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Major Mike Webb d/b/a Friends for Mike Webb, Major Mike Webb for U.S. Congress (VA8), Major Mike Webb for VA and Major Mike Webb for APS Board

1210 S. Glebe Rd., #40391

Arlington, VA 22204

Respondents

Anthony S. Fauci

National Institute for Allergy & Infectious Disease (NIAID)

Rochelle Walensky

Centers for Disease Control & Prevention

Janet Woodcock

Food & Drug Administration (FDA)

Mohammed Norman Oliver

Virginia Department of Health (VDH)

Pfizer, Inc.

Modernatx Inc.

Johnson & Johnson Inc.

Facebook Inc.

Twitter Inc.

Linkedin

University of Virginia

Donald S. Beyer

Timothy M. Kaine

Mark R. Warner

Justin M. Wilson

25 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Envelope

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) Memorandum in Support filed by Major Mike Webb re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Vaccines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope). (sbea,) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

9 #1

Table of Exhibits A-C

#9

(#9) EMERGENCY MOTION For Summary Judgment Against The Vaccines Policy by Major Mike Webb. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits A-C). (sbea,) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

8 #1

Table of Exhibits A-C

#8

(#8) EMERGENCY MOTION For Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) by Major Mike Webb. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits A-C). (sbea,) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Summary Judgment on Vaccines by Major Mike Webb. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Major Mike Webb. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 Amended Complaint, by Major Mike Webb. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

4 #1

Certification

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc., Anthony S. Fauci, Food & Drug Administration (FDA), Dionne Hardy, Mark R. Herring, Johnson & Johnson Inc., Timothy M. Kaine, Modernatx Inc., National Institute for Allergy & Infectious Disease (NIAID), Ralph S. Northam, Office of Management and Budget (OMB), Office of the State Attorney General, Mohammed Norman Oliver, Pfizer, Inc., University of Virginia, Virginia Department of Health (VDH), Rochelle Walensky, Mark R. Warner, Justin M. Wilson, Janet Woodcock, BIONTECH SE, Janssen Global Services, LLC, Jennifer R. Psaki, White House Communications Agency, Vivek Murthy, Office of the Surgeon General, Lloyd J. Austin, Department of Defense (DOD), Christine E. Wormoth, Department of the Army (DA), Xavier Beccera, Department of Health & Human Services (HHS), Ted Britt Ford of Fairfax, Richard D. Holcolm, Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles, Ingrid H. Morroy, Commissioner of Revenue for County of Arlington, Capital Investment Advisors, LLC, A-1 Towing of Northern Virginia, John and Jane Does, filed by Major Mike Webb. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #1

Application to Proceed with Prepaying Fees (Long Form)

#2

(#2) ORDER that the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to send a copy of the in forma pauperis application to Webb. Webb must complete the form, answering the questions as accurately as possible, and file it with the Court no later than August 16, 2021. Failure to comply with this request will result in the case being dismissed without prejudice. The Court ORDERS Webb to file a signed Ghostwriting Form (a copy of which is enclosed) and file it with the Court no later than August 16, 2021. Failure to comply with this request will result in the case being dismissed without prejudice. the Court ORDERS that the Clerk provisionally file the proffered Complaint; and it is further ORDERED that, no later than August 16, 2021, Webb SHALL file an Amended Complaint, which outlines in simple and straightforward terms why he thinks that he is entitled to relief and why the Court has jurisdiction over his case. The failure to strictly comply with the Courts directives and with applicable rules will result in DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. See Order for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 7/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed with Prepaying Fees (Long Form)). Clerk mailed Order, "IFP Application" and Ghostwriting Form to plaintiff. (sbea,) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

1 #13

Exhibit K

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #1

Complaint (Received)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Memorandum in Support filed by Major Mike Webb re: #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #7 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Vaccines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope). (sbea,) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EMERGENCY MOTION For Summary Judgment Against The Vaccines Policy by Major Mike Webb. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits A-C). (sbea,) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EMERGENCY MOTION For Temporary Restraining Order (TRO) by Major Mike Webb. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits A-C). (sbea,) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Summary Judgment on Vaccines by Major Mike Webb. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Major Mike Webb. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 Amended Complaint, by Major Mike Webb. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Facebook Inc., Anthony S. Fauci, Food & Drug Administration (FDA), Dionne Hardy, Mark R. Herring, Johnson & Johnson Inc., Timothy M. Kaine, Modernatx Inc., National Institute for Allergy & Infectious Disease (NIAID), Ralph S. Northam, Office of Management and Budget (OMB), Office of the State Attorney General, Mohammed Norman Oliver, Pfizer, Inc., University of Virginia, Virginia Department of Health (VDH), Rochelle Walensky, Mark R. Warner, Justin M. Wilson, Janet Woodcock, BIONTECH SE, Janssen Global Services, LLC, Jennifer R. Psaki, White House Communications Agency, Vivek Murthy, Office of the Surgeon General, Lloyd J. Austin, Department of Defense (DOD), Christine E. Wormoth, Department of the Army (DA), Xavier Beccera, Department of Health & Human Services (HHS), Ted Britt Ford of Fairfax, Richard D. Holcolm, Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles, Ingrid H. Morroy, Commissioner of Revenue for County of Arlington, Capital Investment Advisors, LLC, A-1 Towing of Northern Virginia, John and Jane Does, filed by Major Mike Webb. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Major Mike Webb. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER that the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to send a copy of the in forma pauperis application to Webb. Webb must complete the form, answering the questions as accurately as possible, and file it with the Court no later than August 16, 2021. Failure to comply with this request will result in the case being dismissed without prejudice. The Court ORDERS Webb to file a signed Ghostwriting Form (a copy of which is enclosed) and file it with the Court no later than August 16, 2021. Failure to comply with this request will result in the case being dismissed without prejudice. the Court ORDERS that the Clerk provisionally file the proffered Complaint; and it is further ORDERED that, no later than August 16, 2021, Webb SHALL file an Amended Complaint, which outlines in simple and straightforward terms why he thinks that he is entitled to relief and why the Court has jurisdiction over his case. The failure to strictly comply with the Courts directives and with applicable rules will result in DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. See Order for complete details. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 7/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed with Prepaying Fees (Long Form)). Clerk mailed Order, "IFP Application" and Ghostwriting Form to plaintiff. (sbea,) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Major Mike Webb. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (Received), #2 Table of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Rule 83.1, #17 Praceipe)(adun, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Major Mike Webb d/b/a Friends for Mike Webb, Major Mike Webb for U.S. Congress (VA8), Major Mike Webb for VA and Major Mike Webb for APS Board is a litigant

Latest cases where Virginia Department of Health (VDH) is a litigant

Latest cases where THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA is a litigant