This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2019 at 07:32:35 (UTC).

Maisel, et al v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Maisel filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Transamerica Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing and Kirtan Khalsa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00051

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Laura Fashing

Presiding Judge

Kirtan Khalsa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Albert Lloyd Maisel

Jeanie Michelle Maisel

Defendant

Transamerica Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jerrald J Roehl

Attorney at THE ROEHL LAW FIRM, P.C.

300 Central Avenue Sw, Suite 2500E

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew G. Schultz

Attorney at Rodey Dickason Sloan Akin & Robb, P.A.

P.O. Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103

Leslie McCarthy Apodaca

Attorney at Rodey, Dickason, Sloan, Akin & Robb

Po Box 1888

Albuquerque, NM 87103-1888

Hutson B. Smelley

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1001 Fannin Street, Ste. 2700

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas F. A. Hetherington

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1001 Fannin Street, Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Stipulated Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (tkl) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#2

(#2) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

15 #3

Exhibit

15 #2

Exhibit

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/1/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/25/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/15/2019. (pv) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Commonwealth General Corporation for Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#8

(#8) AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing (amended to correct case number only) setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/1/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/15/2019. (cda) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#18

(#18) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Albert Lloyd Maisel, Jeanie Michelle Maisel. (Roehl, Jerrald) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#4

(#6) AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Transamerica Life Insurance Company to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended until February 11, 2019. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#1

Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6235099 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit

#15

(#15) DECLARATION re #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Stipulated Order of Dismissal With Prejudice by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. (tkl) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Albert Lloyd Maisel, Jeanie Michelle Maisel. (Roehl, Jerrald) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • (#17) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 16 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, 12 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Albert Lloyd Maisel, Jeanie Michelle Maisel. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • (#16) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Transamerica Life Insurance Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Apodaca, Leslie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DECLARATION re #14 MOTION to Dismiss by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Dismiss by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Commonwealth General Corporation for Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6260937 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6260848 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing (amended to correct case number only) setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/1/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/15/2019. (cda) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference for 4/1/2019 at 02:30 PM in Albuquerque - Telephonic Hearing/Conference before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan due by 3/25/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/15/2019. (pv) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Transamerica Life Insurance Company to file answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended until February 11, 2019. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Transamerica Life Insurance Company's answer due 2/11/2019. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ccp) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • (#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6235099 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Transamerica Life Insurance Company from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2019-09026. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Apodaca, Leslie) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.