This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2020 at 07:54:16 (UTC).

MAINS et al v. THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 MAINS filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD G. SMITH and JOHN M. GALLAGHER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00112

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD G. SMITH

JOHN M. GALLAGHER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREA MAINS

SCOTT MAINS

Defendant

THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENNETH T. LEVINE

Attorney at DE LUCA LEVINE LLC

Three Valley Square, Suite 220

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Defendant Attorneys

C. TYLER HAVEY

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 610

Phila, PA 19103

ANN T. FIELD

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

2005 Market St Suite 2900, One Commerce Sq

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ERIC C. ROSENBERG

Attorney at Gordon & Rees, LLP

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street, Suite 610

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCOTT MAINS, ANDREA MAINS. THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY waiver sent on 1/15/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (LEVINE, KENNETH) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE209377.), filed by SCOTT MAINS, ANDREA MAINS.(bw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY.(FIELD, ANN) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH TO HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 02/28/2020. 02/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by C. TYLER HAVEY on behalf of THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY with Certificate of Service(HAVEY, C.) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC C. ROSENBERG on behalf of THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, ERIC) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY.(FIELD, ANN) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC C. ROSENBERG on behalf of THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY with Certificate of Service(ROSENBERG, ERIC) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by C. TYLER HAVEY on behalf of THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY with Certificate of Service(HAVEY, C.) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH TO HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 02/28/2020. 02/28/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY.(FIELD, ANN) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY.(FIELD, ANN) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SCOTT MAINS, ANDREA MAINS. THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY waiver sent on 1/15/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (LEVINE, KENNETH) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket1 Summons Issued as to THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 1/8/20 (bw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANDREA MAINS, SCOTT MAINS. (bw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE209377.), filed by SCOTT MAINS, ANDREA MAINS.(bw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.