This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2019 at 08:36:53 (UTC).

Mahoney et al v. Centura Health Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality case was filed by Mahoney against Centura Health Corporation in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Colorado District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02478

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Lewis T. Babcock

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M.D. Barbara Morris

Cornelius D Mahoney

Barbara Morris

Defendant

Centura Health Corporation

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #18 Order (angar, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Request for Expedited Ruling [Doc #8 ] is GRANTED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/4/2019. (angar, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Cornelius D Mahoney, Barbara Morris. (Spitalnick, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#17

(#17) COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held before Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/3/2019. Granting #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Request for Expedited Ruling. Court will incorporate its ruling in a written order. Court Reporter: Julie Thomas. (ebuch) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Felipe S. Bohnet-Gomez on behalf of Barbara MorrisAttorney Felipe S. Bohnet-Gomez added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Bohnet-Gomez, Felipe) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew J. Cron on behalf of Barbara MorrisAttorney Matthew J. Cron added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Cron, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE TO THE COLORADO END OF LIFE OPTIONS ACT by Defendant Centura Health Corporation (Sabey, Melvin) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction And Request For Expedited Ruling filed by Defendant Centura Health Corporation. (Sabey, Melvin) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Until After the Court Resolves Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/17/2019. (ebuch) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Until After the Court Resolves Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand by Plaintiffs Cornelius D Mahoney, Barbara Morris. (Wienczkowski, Steven) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

9 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

9 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Centura Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sabey, Melvin) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#10

(#10) MINUTE ORDER: Defendant shall respond to #8 Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Request for Expedited Ruling on or before 9/26/2019. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/12/2019. (ebuch) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Centura Health Corporation, filed by Barbara Morris, Cornelius D Mahoney.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Maxwell Spitalnick on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jason Maxwell Spitalnick added to party Cornelius D Mahoney(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Maxwell Spitalnick added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Spitalnick, Jason) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #18 Order (angar, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Request for Expedited Ruling [Doc #8 ] is GRANTED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/4/2019. (angar, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held before Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/3/2019. Granting #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Request for Expedited Ruling. Court will incorporate its ruling in a written order. Court Reporter: Julie Thomas. (ebuch) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Felipe S. Bohnet-Gomez on behalf of Barbara MorrisAttorney Felipe S. Bohnet-Gomez added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Bohnet-Gomez, Felipe) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew J. Cron on behalf of Barbara MorrisAttorney Matthew J. Cron added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Cron, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE TO THE COLORADO END OF LIFE OPTIONS ACT by Defendant Centura Health Corporation (Sabey, Melvin) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction And Request For Expedited Ruling filed by Defendant Centura Health Corporation. (Sabey, Melvin) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss Until After the Court Resolves Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/17/2019. (ebuch) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Until After the Court Resolves Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand by Plaintiffs Cornelius D Mahoney, Barbara Morris. (Wienczkowski, Steven) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER: Defendant shall respond to #8 Motion for Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Request for Expedited Ruling on or before 9/26/2019. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/12/2019. (ebuch) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Centura Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Sabey, Melvin) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Cornelius D Mahoney, Barbara Morris. (Spitalnick, Jason) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • (#6) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Centura Health Corporation, filed by Barbara Morris, Cornelius D Mahoney.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Maxwell Spitalnick on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jason Maxwell Spitalnick added to party Cornelius D Mahoney(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Maxwell Spitalnick added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Spitalnick, Jason) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven J. Wienczkowski on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Steven J. Wienczkowski added to party Cornelius D Mahoney(pty:pla), Attorney Steven J. Wienczkowski added to party Barbara Morris(pty:pla) (Wienczkowski, Steven) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Centura Health Corporation (Sabey, Melvin) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Centura Health Corporation from District Court, Arapahoe County, Case Number 2019CV031980. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6871765), filed by Centura Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Register of Actions)(Sabey, Melvin) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.