This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:10:02 (UTC).

Mahmood v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Mahmood filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against U S Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mae A. D'Agostino and Daniel J. Stewart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00782

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mae A. D'Agostino

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Stewart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood

Hyderabad, TELA 500008

Defendant

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) REPORT-RECOMMENDATION and ORDER: re #1 Complaint filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood: Recommended, that Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. #1 ) be Dismissed with prejudice; Ordered, that Plaintiff's Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing (Dkt. No. #3 ) is Denied; Ordered, that Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Emergency Funds (Dkt. No. #4 ) is Denied; and Ordered, that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Report-Recommendation and Order upon Plaintiff. (Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2021, Case Review Deadline 8/9/2021), ORDER, Motions terminated: #4 MOTION requesting Emergency Funds filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood, #5 MOTION requesting expedite hearing filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood, #3 Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood requesting to participate in electronic filing submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood.Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 07/23/2021. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff at 9-4-86/89, Flat #201, Khan Tower, Salarjung Colony, Hyderabad, Telangana 500008, India via international mail on 7/26/2021.)(hmr) Modified on 7/26/2021 (hmr). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER: that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis, Dkt. No. #2 , is Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 07/23/2021. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff at 9-4-86/89, Flat #201, Khan Tower, Salarjung Colony, Hyderabad, Telangana 500008, India via international mail on 7/26/2021.)(hmr) Modified on 7/26/2021 (hmr). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#7

(#7) PRO SE NOTICE mailed to plaintiff along with copy of the docket sheet at time the complaint was filed. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#5

(#5) MOTION requesting expedite hearing filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION requesting Emergency Funds filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood requesting to participate in electronic filing submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

2 #3

Proposed Summons as to the U.S. Attorney General

2 #2

Proposed Summons as to the U.S. Attorney

2 #1

Proposed Summons as to Office of General Counsel

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Office of General Counsel, #2 Proposed Summons as to the U.S. Attorney, #3 Proposed Summons as to the U.S. Attorney General) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 7/28/21. (ban) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis & #9 Report and Recommendation and Order: Clerk removed "7/23/2021" and added "7/26/2021" as the date that these documents were served on pro se plaintiff, since on 7/23/2021 - there was an update needed on Stamps.com and the update was completed on 7/26/2021. These documents were mailed to pro se plaintiff via international mail on 7/26/2021. (hmr) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT-RECOMMENDATION and ORDER: re #1 Complaint filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood: Recommended, that Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. #1 ) be Dismissed with prejudice; Ordered, that Plaintiff's Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing (Dkt. No. #3 ) is Denied; Ordered, that Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Emergency Funds (Dkt. No. #4 ) is Denied; and Ordered, that the Clerk of the Court serve a copy of this Report-Recommendation and Order upon Plaintiff. (Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2021, Case Review Deadline 8/9/2021), ORDER, Motions terminated: #4 MOTION requesting Emergency Funds filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood, #5 MOTION requesting expedite hearing filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood, #3 Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood requesting to participate in electronic filing submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood.Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 07/23/2021. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff at 9-4-86/89, Flat #201, Khan Tower, Salarjung Colony, Hyderabad, Telangana 500008, India via international mail on 7/26/2021.)(hmr) Modified on 7/26/2021 (hmr). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: that Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis, Dkt. No. #2 , is Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 07/23/2021. (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff at 9-4-86/89, Flat #201, Khan Tower, Salarjung Colony, Hyderabad, Telangana 500008, India via international mail on 7/26/2021.)(hmr) Modified on 7/26/2021 (hmr). (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRO SE NOTICE mailed to plaintiff along with copy of the docket sheet at time the complaint was filed. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketTEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 1:20-cv-207 and 1:20-cv-409. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket(#6) TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION requesting expedite hearing filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION requesting Emergency Funds filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter Request/Motion from Pro Se Litigant Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood requesting to participate in electronic filing submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Office of General Counsel, #2 Proposed Summons as to the U.S. Attorney, #3 Proposed Summons as to the U.S. Attorney General) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Homeland Security filed by Mohammed Sayeed Mahmood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, ) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant