This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2021 at 23:52:35 (UTC).

Magnum Property Investments, LLC v. Anna Karapetian et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 Magnum Property Investments, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Anna Karapetian. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and Mark C. Scarsi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03542

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Magnum Property Investments, LLC

Defendants

Does 1-10

Joseph Policarpio

Tarzana, CA 91356

Anna Karapetian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lane M Nussbaum

Attorney at Nussbaum APC

27489 Agoura Road Suite 102

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Brandon S Dimond

Attorney at Nussbaum APC

27489 Agoura Road Suite 102

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Van Nuys Courthouse, No.20VEUD00157 (lc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Case remanded Sua Sponte for lack of subject matter jurisdiction to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Van Nuys Courthouse, Case number 20VEUD00157 Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (lc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER DENYING REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. This case is hereby REMANDED to state court #3 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lc) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Joseph Policarpio, re Notice of Removal #1 served on 4/26/2021. (et) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Joseph Policarpio. (et) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Joseph Policarpio. (et) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number 20VEUD00157 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson., filed by Defendant Joseph Policarpio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (et) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAGNUM PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon S Dimond

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lane M Nussbaum