Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. v. Kurin, Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Kurin, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2546273.) - filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (nmg) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,855,001 ;US 10,028,689 . (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kurin, Inc.- filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(McCann, Douglas) (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/11/2019) (fms). (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Kurin, Inc. on 3/8/2019. (lak) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPATENT REPORT NOTICE: Please note that if patents are being added to this case (D.I. #5 ), the filing party should complete the Report to Commissioner of Patents & Trademarks, and enter it on the docket using the PATENT/TRADEMARK REPORT event in the OTHER DOCUMENT list. The patent report form can be found at www.ded.uscourts.gov under the Clerk's Office FORMS button. (fms) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 9,855,001 ;US 10,028,689 ;US 10,039,483 ;US 10,220,139 . (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. Kurin, Inc. served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: Per request of filer, Exhibit D to D.I. #5 has been removed and replaced with the full version of the exhibit. (fms) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Kurin, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to April 29, 2019 - filed by Kurin, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant Kurin, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to April 29, 2019 filed by Kurin, Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Kurin, Inc. answer due 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/20/2019. (fms) (Entered: 03/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #5 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Kurin, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karen I. Boyd, Louis Wai and Jacob S. Zweig - filed by Kurin, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karen I. Boyd, Louis Wai and Jacob S. Zweig filed by Kurin, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/1/2019. (fms) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Jacob Zweig, Louis Wai, and Karen I. Boyd for Kurin, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Order Setting Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/17/2019 at 03:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/9/2019. (nmf) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FIRST AMENDED ANSWER and COUNTERCLAIMS against Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. by Kurin, Inc.(fms) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketD.I. #13 has been re-docketed using the answer docket event. (fms) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mathias Samuel, Juanita Brooks, Corrin Drakulich, Bethany Mihalik and Maria Elena Stiteler - filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mathias Samuel, Juanita Brooks, Corrin Drakulich, Bethany Mihalik and Maria Elena Stiteler filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/23/2019. (fms) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) First set of requests for production and (2) First set of interrogatories filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Seraphine - filed by Kurin, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jennifer Seraphine filed by Kurin, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/4/2019. (fms) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Kurin, Inc. (Nos. 1-59) filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Oakes on behalf of Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Connolly from Robert M. Oakes)(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Scheduling Conference held on 6/17/2019. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) Counsel to submit the final revised proposed scheduling order to the Court. (nmf) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) SO ORDERED, re #22 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/20/2019. (nmf) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 12/16/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2019. Discovery due by 7/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/5/2021. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 2/11/2020. A Markman Hearing is set for 3/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/30/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. A Jury Trial is set for 7/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 6/20/2019. (nmf) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak) Modified on 6/21/2019 (cak). (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: This matter has been referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge, not Judge Fallon (cak) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Kurin, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The order previously filed as D.I. 27 setting an ADR teleconference before Judge Fallon has been deleted per the correcting entry issued on 6/21/2019. (lih) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to First Set of Requests for Production filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Defendant Kurin, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 1-38) and Objections and Responses to Defendant Kurin, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-8) filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Richard G. Patton by Kurin, Inc. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action and Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Maria Elena Stiteler,Corrin N. Drakulich,Mathias Samuel for Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Third Party Pathway, LLC's objections to Plaintiff's Subpoena to Produce Documents filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketSet Hearings: A Discovery Conference is set per request of counsel for 10/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. (nmf) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Kurin, Inc. (Nos. 1-9) filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Kurin, Inc.'s Invalidity Contentions filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketThe 10/2/2019 Discovery Conference is cancelled per counsel as it is no longer needed. (nmf) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Douglas E. McCann regarding Parties request to Amend Section G of the Protective Order - re #23 SO ORDERED, Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Amended Protective Order)(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Kurin's response to Magnolia's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-8); and (2) Kurin's Disclosure of Claim Terms for Construction filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) STIPULATED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/1/2019. (fms) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Proposed Terms for Construction filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for all disputes relating to discovery and the protective order. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/7/2019. (nmf) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of Proposed Claim Construction Dates to Various - filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Docket(#41) ORAL ORDER: The Court, having reviewed the case history in light of the October 7, 2019 referral, hereby ORDERS that the procedures for resolving a dispute relating to discovery or the protective order set out in the Scheduling Order, (D.I. 24 at 9-10), will be modified as follows: Should counsel find, after good faith efforts including verbal communication among Delaware and Lead Counsel for all parties to the dispute, that they are unable to resolve a discovery or protective order matter, the parties involved in the dispute shall submit a joint letter with the text set out in the Court's standard Rule 16 Scheduling Order for Patent cases, which can be found in the "Forms" tab of Magistrate Judge Burke's page on the District Court's website. For disputes relating to discovery, the moving party (i.e., the party seeking relief from the Court) should also file a Motion For Teleconference To Resolve Discovery Dispute, and for disputes relating to protective orders, the parties shall file a Joint Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Protective Order Dispute. The suggested text for these motions can be found in the same Forms tab. The Court will thereafter set a discovery or protective order dispute telephone conference. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/8/2019. (mlc) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #40 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME of Proposed Claim Construction Dates to Various filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/8/2019. (fms) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE OF SERVICE of proposed constructions for claim terms filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Proposed Claim Constructions filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parties to File Joint Claim Construction Chart to October 23, 2019 - filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #44 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Parties to File Joint Claim Construction Chart to October 23, 2019 filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/22/2019. (fms) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION for Claim Construction - filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MOTION Claim Construction - filed by Kurin, Inc. (nmf) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) CLAIM Construction Chart by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Disputed Terms, #2 Exhibit B - Agreed-Upon Terms, #3 Exhibit C - '001 patent, #4 Exhibit D - '689 patent, #5 Exhibit E - '483 patent, #6 Exhibit F - '139 patent, #7 Exhibit G - App. No. 15457082 re '001 patent, #8 Exhibit H - App. No. 15832087 re '689 patent, #9 Exhibit I - App. No. 15832091 re '483 patent, #10 Exhibit J - App. No. 15899856 re '139 patent, #11 Exhibit K - App. No. 60870599, #12 Exhibit L - App. No. 11955635, #13 Exhibit M - App. No. 13954528, #14 Exhibit N - App. No. 14049326, #15 Exhibit O - App. No. 14498102, #16 Exhibit P - App. No. 14088842, #17 Exhibit Q - App. No. 15432310, #18 Exhibit R - App. No. 15435684, #19 Exhibit S - App. No. 15448891)(Oakes, Robert) Modified on 10/24/2019 (fms). (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: Kurin Inc.'s Motion for Claim Construction has been refiled correctly with the correct pdf per request of filer. (nmf) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketRemark re: D.I. 45 Claim Construction Chart (Exhibits C-S). The parties are to submit with the Joint Claim Construction Chart separate text-searchable pdfs for each asserted patent(s). Parties shall file the separate pdfs electronically using CM/ECF. Each separate pdf shall be labeled using the last three digits of the number of the patent in question so that it is possible to determine from looking at the docket sheet the patent in a particular exhibit. (fms) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark: The claim construction chart filed at D.I. 45 has been removed from the docket as it has been refiled at D.I. #48 in accordance with Judge Connolly's filing requirements. The file date of D.I. #48 has been adjusted to 10/23/2019. (fms) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Kurin's Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff (No. 9) filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Maria Elena Stiteler as Counsel by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Defendant Kurin, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories (No. 9) filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Kurin's Answering Claim Construction Brief; (2) Declaration of Warren P. Heim in support filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketORAL ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Markman Hearing is rescheduled for 4/15/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B before Judge Colm F. Connolly. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/15/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#55) ORAL ORDER: This matter has been referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for ADR. Counsel are to advise on or before Wednesday, February 11, 2020, by email to Judge Thynge, with a copy to her Judicial Administrator, Ms. Kennedy, as well as opposing counsel, their clients interest in mediation and the timing when mediation is preferred with a very brief explanation why. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/22/20. (cak) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sabrina D. Wilson - filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #56 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sabrina D. Wilson filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 1/27/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Second Set of Requests for Production to Defendant Kurin, Inc. (Nos. 60-66) and Second Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Kurin, Inc. (Nos. 9-12) filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sur-reply claim construction brief filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Joint APPENDIX re #59 Joint Claim Construction Brief by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix JA0001-JA0199, #2 Appendix JA0200-JA0350)(Oakes, Robert) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories to Defendant Kurin, Inc. (Nos. 13-14) filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Kurin's response to Magnolia's Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9-12); (2) Kurin's response to Magnolia's Second Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 60-66); and (3) Kurin's Third Set of Interrogatories to Magnolia (No. 10) filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jon Hangartner - filed by Kurin, Inc.. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #63 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jon Hangartner filed by Kurin, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 3/5/2020. (fms) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Amended Initial Disclosures filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Kurin's response to Magnolia's Third Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 13-14) filed by Kurin, Inc..(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) CLAIM Construction Chart by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Disputed Constructions, #2 Exhibit B - Agreed-Upon Constructions)(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Douglas E. McCann regarding Claim Construction Hearing. (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Defendant Kurin, Inc.'s Third Set of Interrogatories (No. 10) filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc..(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORAL ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's letter dated March 27, 2020 (D.I. #67 ). In light of Defendant's objection to the use of a shared software presentation, the Court will convene the hearing by telephone at 9:15 a.m. on April 15, 2020. Defendant shall be responsible for arranging the teleconference. If a party wishes to rely on slides during the telephone hearing, it must submit the slides by email to the Court no later than 24 hours before the telephone hearing. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/2/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketORAL ORDER: The Court has reviewed carefully the parties' claim construction briefing. Defendant is hereby reminded that it is the practice of this judge not to entertain invalidity and unenforceability contentions made directly or indirectly through claim construction briefing and argument. The Court would like to know at the outset of tomorrow's argument whether the parties would agree to construe "diverter" to mean "a component that changes the direction of the flow of the fluid." Defendant shall be prepared to explain to the Court how "sequester" is different from "isolate." Plaintiff shall be prepared to explain to the Court how a housing can exist without housing anything and how an enclosure can exist without enclosing anything. The Court expects that the argument tomorrow should last no more than 60 minutes. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/14/2020. (nmf) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colm F. Connolly - Markman Hearing held on 4/15/2020. (Court Reporter V. Gunning.) (nmf) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc.. (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Douglas E. McCann regarding the reduction in claim terms. (McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #69 Stipulation filed by Magnolia Medical Technologies, Inc., Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Fact Discovery completed by 9/18/2020., Opening Expert Reports due by 10/16/2020., Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 4/16/2020. (fms) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Douglas E. McCann regarding Proposed Structure for "Diverter". (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McCann, Douglas) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less