This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2022 at 09:00:55 (UTC).

MAGNER v. PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 MAGNER filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark R. Hornak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01387

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark R. Hornak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW MAGNER

Defendant

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua P. Ward

Attorney at J.P. Ward & Associates, LLC

201 South Highland Avenue, Suite 201

Pittsburgh, PA 15206

Travis Andrew Gordon

Attorney at J.P. Ward & Associates

201 S Highland Avenue, Suite 201

Pittsburgh, PA 15206

Defendant Attorney

Lauren M. Burnette

Attorney at Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.

12276 San Jose Blvd., Suite 718

Jacksonville, FL 32223

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Common Pleas Filings

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/30/22. (jad) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying PRA Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice of Mediation by Howard J Schulberg. Mediation Date 1/30/2023 (Schulberg, Howard) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gordon, Travis) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MATTHEW MAGNER. (Gordon, Travis) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MATTHEW MAGNER. (Gordon, Travis) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gordon, Travis) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Mediation by Howard J Schulberg. Mediation Date 1/30/2023 (Schulberg, Howard) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • Docket(#7) ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of this date of this Order, counsel shall confer and submit to the Court the following documents: (a) A written report required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f), in the applicable format as set forth in the Appendices to the Local Rules; and, (b) A stipulation selecting an ADR process (pursuant to Local Rule 16.2) (current form). Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/7/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying PRA Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Burnette, Lauren) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/30/22. (jad) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal, ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 10/6/2022. (jma) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number AR 22-002763 Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7319780), filed by PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Common Pleas Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jma) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less