This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 07:14:34 (UTC).

Magee v. Thrush et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Magee filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Thrush. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Victor Magee

Pinckneyville, IL 62274

Defendants

C/O Kelley

Lieutenant Thrush

C/O Redshaw

Warden

C/O Bainter

Sergent Myers

C/O McKean

C/O Graham

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Victor Magee, an Illinois prisoner incarcerated in Pinckneyville Correctional Center, brings this pro se lawsuit regarding events that occurred while he was incarcerated in the Illinois River Correctional Center, in Fulton County, Illinois. He initiated this case in the Southern District of Illinois. That Court observed that the alleged events occurred at Illinois River Correctional Center and stated its intention to transfer this case to the judicial district in which Fulton County is located, which the Court mistakenly identified as the Northern District of Illinois. (Dkt. 4.) In fact, Fulton County is located in the Central District of Illinois, 28 U.S.C. 93(b), where all Defendants appear to be located and all significant events or omissions occurred. This case, moreover, has no discernible connection to the Northern District of Illinois. See 28 U.S.C. 1391 (providing districts in which lawsuits properly may be brought). This case is transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Peoria Division, for consideration of Plaintiff's complaint #1 , and application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , and for whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. This case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case transferred. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/30/2019. (ksp) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victor Magee. (jaj) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#6

(#6) MAILED Prisoner Local Rule 83.15 Letter to all parties of record. (kp, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#8

(#8) TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois, Peoria Division the electronic record. (kp, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 19-1396-SMY. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/26/2019. (jaj) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Victor Magee.(jaj) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#5

(#5) RECEIVED from Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01396 (kp) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the CENTRAL DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS as case 1:20-cv-01008, filed 01/08/2020. (bg, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois, Peoria Division the electronic record. (kp, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Victor Magee, an Illinois prisoner incarcerated in Pinckneyville Correctional Center, brings this pro se lawsuit regarding events that occurred while he was incarcerated in the Illinois River Correctional Center, in Fulton County, Illinois. He initiated this case in the Southern District of Illinois. That Court observed that the alleged events occurred at Illinois River Correctional Center and stated its intention to transfer this case to the judicial district in which Fulton County is located, which the Court mistakenly identified as the Northern District of Illinois. (Dkt. 4.) In fact, Fulton County is located in the Central District of Illinois, 28 U.S.C. 93(b), where all Defendants appear to be located and all significant events or omissions occurred. This case, moreover, has no discernible connection to the Northern District of Illinois. See 28 U.S.C. 1391 (providing districts in which lawsuits properly may be brought). This case is transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Central District of Illinois, Peoria Division, for consideration of Plaintiff's complaint #1 , and application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , and for whatever other action the transferee court deems appropriate. This case and all pending motions are terminated on this Court's docket. Civil case transferred. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Prisoner Local Rule 83.15 Letter to all parties of record. (kp, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RECEIVED from Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01396 (kp) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/30/2019. (ksp) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 19-1396-SMY. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 12/26/2019. (jaj) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Victor Magee. (jaj) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Victor Magee.(jaj) [Transferred from Illinois Southern on 1/2/2020.] (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.