This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2021 at 08:41:02 (UTC).

Magee v. Lawson et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Magee filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lawson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00066

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Magee, Jr

South Bend, IN 46601

Defendants

Julie Lawson

Russ Olmstead

Stephanie

Becky

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) RECEIPT of Prisoner Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis from David Magee, Jr. Previously granted per DE #3 Order. (kms) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

6 #2

Envelope

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Becky, Stephanie, filed by David Magee, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(kms) Modified on 3/1/2021 (kms). (Entered: 03/01/2021)

5 #2

Envelope

5 #1

Cover Letter

#5

(#5) RECEIPT of USM 285 Form, from David Magee, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(kms) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER: The court DISMISSES Julie Lawson and Russ Olmstead; GRANTS David Magee, Jr., until 3/5/2021, to file an amended complaint on a Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form; and CAUTIONS David Magee, Jr., if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 1/28/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING plaintiff, David Magee, Jr., IDOC # 905929, St. Joseph County Jail # 23639, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTING the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 1/28/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund Dept)(lhc) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff David Magee, Jr. (kms) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Becky, Julie Lawson, Russ Olmstead, Stephanie, filed by David Magee, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Magee)(kms) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket***Amended Pleading Deadline terminated. (kms) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RECEIPT of Prisoner Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis from David Magee, Jr. Previously granted per DE #3 Order. (kms) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Becky, Stephanie, filed by David Magee, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(kms) Modified on 3/1/2021 (kms). (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RECEIPT of USM 285 Form, from David Magee, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(kms) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: The court DISMISSES Julie Lawson and Russ Olmstead; GRANTS David Magee, Jr., until 3/5/2021, to file an amended complaint on a Pro Se 14 (INND Rev. 2/20) Prisoner Complaint form; and CAUTIONS David Magee, Jr., if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A without further notice because the current complaint does not state a claim for which relief can be granted. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 1/28/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING plaintiff, David Magee, Jr., IDOC # 905929, St. Joseph County Jail # 23639, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTING the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 1/28/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund Dept)(lhc) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff David Magee, Jr. (kms) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Becky, Julie Lawson, Russ Olmstead, Stephanie, filed by David Magee, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Magee)(kms) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where , BECKY is a litigant

Latest cases where Stephanie is a litigant