This case was last updated from PACER on 09/09/2019 at 07:38:16 (UTC).

Magana v. Northwest Iowa Pork

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 Magana filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Northwest Iowa Pork. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly K.E. Mahoney and Leonard T Strand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-04033

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly K.E. Mahoney

Presiding Judge

Leonard T Strand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Magana

Defendants

Itoham America, Inc.

Northwest Iowa Pork

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terry A White

Attorney at Carlson & Burnett LLP

17525 Arbor Street

Omaha, NE 68130

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Kallstrom-Schreckengost

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

10050 Regency Circle, Suite 400, ***Ecf

Omaha, NE 68114

Christopher E Hoyme

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, LLP

10050 Regency Circle, Suite 400, ***Ecf

Omaha, NE 68114

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Exhibit C

5 #3

Exhibit D

5 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Northwest Iowa Pork Responses due by 7/26/2019 Check Status on MJ Consent due by 7/26/2019. (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

5 #6

Exhibit G

#4

(#4) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Northwest Iowa Pork (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#2

(#2) DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the Civil Removal Case Packet. (skm) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#8) ORDER granting (5) Motion to Dismiss Count II in case 5:19-cv-04030-LTS-KEM; granting (6) Motion to Dismiss Count II in case 5:19-cv-04032-LTS-KEM; granting #6 Motion to Dismiss Count II in case 5:19-cv-04033-LTS-KEM. These cases shall proceed with regard to Count I only. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/27/2019. Associated Cases: 5:19-cv-04030-LTS-KEM, 5:19-cv-04032-LTS-KEM, 5:19-cv-04033-LTS-KEM (des) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Jose Magana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G) (skm) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

5 #4

Exhibit E

5 #5

Exhibit F

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 8/11/2019. (skm) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#7

(#7) DEFENDANTS Brief re #6 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Brief in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Northwest Iowa Pork (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Woodbury County, case number CVCV186890 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2978059), filed by Itoham America, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 9/10/2019.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents) (Hoyme, Christopher) Modified text on 7/12/2019 (skm). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting (5) Motion to Dismiss Count II in case 5:19-cv-04030-LTS-KEM; granting (6) Motion to Dismiss Count II in case 5:19-cv-04032-LTS-KEM; granting #6 Motion to Dismiss Count II in case 5:19-cv-04033-LTS-KEM. These cases shall proceed with regard to Count I only. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 8/27/2019. Associated Cases: 5:19-cv-04030-LTS-KEM, 5:19-cv-04032-LTS-KEM, 5:19-cv-04033-LTS-KEM (des) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. No conflicts identified. (src) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEFENDANTS Brief re #6 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Brief in Support of Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Northwest Iowa Pork (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Northwest Iowa Pork Responses due by 7/26/2019 Check Status on MJ Consent due by 7/26/2019. (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STATE Court Petition with Jury Demand by Jose Magana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G) (skm) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Northwest Iowa Pork (Kallstrom-Schreckengost, Jessica) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status by 8/11/2019. (skm) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 8/2/2019. (skm) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKET Annotation re #1 Notice of Removal: Please find attached the Civil Removal Case Packet. (skm) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. Conflicts checked; none found. (skm) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from Iowa District Court for Woodbury County, case number CVCV186890 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2978059), filed by Itoham America, Inc. Scheduling Report due by 9/10/2019.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents) (Hoyme, Christopher) Modified text on 7/12/2019 (skm). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less