This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/28/2021 at 09:39:32 (UTC).

Maes v. New Mexico Corrections Department et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Maes filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against New Mexico Corrections Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laura Fashing, Kevin R. Sweazea and Kea W. Riggs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00287

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin R. Sweazea

Presiding Judges

Laura Fashing

Kea W. Riggs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Maes

Defendants

New Mexico Corrections Department

Mark Bowen

The GEO Group, Inc.

Henry J. Chance

FNU Doe

Ronald Peters

Christina Jackson

FNU Osorio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frances Crockett Carpenter

Attorney at Law Office of Frances Crockett

925 Luna Circle Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Debra J. Moulton

Attorney at Kennedy, Moulton & Wells PC

2201 San Pedro Ne, Building 3, Suite 200

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Michael S. Jahner

Attorney at YLAW, P.C.

4908 Alameda Blvd. Ne

Albuquerque, NM 87113-1736

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for June 15, 2021 at 10:30 AM. Joint Status Report due by June 8, 2021. (atc) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mark Bowen, Henry J. Chance, Christina Jackson, FNU Osorio, Ronald Peters, The GEO Group, Inc.. (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Jahner on behalf of Mark Bowen, Henry J. Chance, FNU Doe(Sergeant), FNU Osorio, Ronald Peters, The GEO Group, Inc. (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Michael Maes of Extension for GEO Defendants to Answer Complaint (Carpenter, Frances) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Mark Bowen, Henry J. Chance, Christina Jackson, FNU Osorio, Ronald Peters, The GEO Group, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Consent to Removal) (Jahner, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#10) Filing fee paid: $ 402, receipt number ALB049449 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Transmittal of State Court Documents by New Mexico Corrections Department (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (Moulton, Debra) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#7) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • Docket(#5) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by New Mexico Corrections Department (Moulton, Debra) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Moulton, Debra) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Debra J. Moulton on behalf of New Mexico Corrections Department (Moulton, Debra) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New Mexico Corrections Department from Second Judicial District Court, case number D-202-CV-2021-01149. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by New Mexico Corrections Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moulton, Debra) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New Mexico Corrections Department (NMCD) is a litigant

Latest cases where GEO GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Debra J. Moulton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Jahner