This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2022 at 07:47:49 (UTC).

Mae-Cliff M, LLC v. Scottsdale Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 Mae-Cliff M, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04038

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mae-Cliff M, LLC

Defendants

Scottsdale Insurance Company

J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Interested Party

Hurricane Ida Program Administrator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stuart E. DesRoches

Attorney at Odom & DesRoches, LLP

650 Poydras St., Suite 2020

New Orleans, LA 70130

Cary Alan DesRoches

Attorney at Cary A. Des Roches, Esq.

225 Phosphor Avenue

Metairie, LA 70005

Defendant Attorneys

Mark Emerson Hanna

Attorney at Mouledoux Bland Legrand & Brackett LLC

701 Poydras Street, Ste 600

New Orleans, LA 70139

Kathryn Lynn Briuglio

Attorney at Mouledoux, Bland, Legrand & Brackett

701 Poydras St., Suite 600

New Orleans, LA 70139

Interested Party Attorney

Francis Joseph Lobrano

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 40th Judicial District Court St. John the Baptist, case number 78525 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9615737) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Filing, #5 State Court Notice of Removal, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Verification, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Certificate of Filing

1 #5

State Court Notice of Removal

1 #6

Notice of Appearance

1 #7

Verification

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#4

(#4) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/26/2022.(mmm) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#5

(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mae-Cliff M, LLC (DesRoches, Cary) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#6

(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with exhibits. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/22.(lag) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice of Compliance by Scottsdale Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Hanna, Mark) Modified text on 11/4/2022 (cwa). (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#8

(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company (Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company (Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Compliance by Scottsdale Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Hanna, Mark) Modified text on 11/4/2022 (cwa). (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS - AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 with exhibits. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/22.(lag) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mae-Cliff M, LLC (DesRoches, Cary) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/26/2022.(mmm) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 40th Judicial District Court St. John the Baptist, case number 78525 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9615737) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Filing, #5 State Court Notice of Removal, #6 Notice of Appearance, #7 Verification, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Mark Emerson Hanna added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hanna, Mark) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hurricane Ida Program Administrator is a litigant

Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant