This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 10:00:13 (UTC).

Madsen et al v. City of Lincoln et al

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Madsen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Lincoln. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cheryl R. Zwart and Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-03075

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

Presiding Judge

Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Benjamin Madsen

Madsen Bowling and Billiard Center

Defendants

Jeffrey Bliemeister

City of Lincoln

Patricia D. Lopez

Lincoln-Lancaster County Health Department

Lancaster County

Leirion Gaylor Baird

Lincoln-Lancaster County Board of Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher M. Ferdico

Attorney at BERRY LAW FIRM - LINCOLN

6940 O Street, Suite 400

Lincoln, NE 68510

John L. Spray

Attorney at MATTSON, RICKETTS LAW FIRM

134 South 13Th Street, Suite 1200

Lincoln, NE 68508-1901

Defendant Attorneys

Yohance Christie

Attorney at CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - LINCOLN

555 South 10Th Street, Suite 300

Lincoln, NE 68508

Andre R. Barry

Attorney at CLINE, WILLIAMS LAW FIRM - LINCOLN

233 South 13Th Street, 1900 Us Bank Building

Lincoln, NE 68508-2095

Danielle L. Rowley

Attorney at CITY OF LINCOLN

555 South 10Th Street, Suite 300

Lincoln, NE 68508

Emily R. Bottorf

Attorney at BAYLOR, EVNEN LAW FIRM

1248 O Street, Suite 600, Wells Fargo Center

Lincoln, NE 68508

Christopher M. Schmidt

Attorney at BAYLOR, EVNEN LAW FIRM

1248 O Street, Suite 600, Wells Fargo Center

Lincoln, NE 68508

 

Court Documents

#27

26 #1

Exhibit A - Lincoln-Lancaster County Department of Health Interlocal Agreement

#26

25 #1

Affidavit Affidavit Ann E. Ames

#25

#24

#22

#19

#15

4 #2

Exhibit Pleadings

#4

3 #2

Exhibit Pleadings

3 #1

Exhibit Pleadings

#3

2 #3

Exhibit Pleadings

2 #2

Exhibit Pleadings

2 #1

Exhibit Pleadings

#2

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand and Request for Hearing and Oral Argument #15 by Attorney Andre R. Barry on behalf of Defendants Leirion Gaylor Baird, Jeffrey Bliemeister, City of Lincoln, Patricia D. Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lincoln-Lancaster County Department of Health Interlocal Agreement)(Barry, Andre) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) INDEX in support of Brief, #24 [Index of Evidence in Support of Defendant Lancaster County's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand] by Attorney Christopher M. Schmidt on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Ann E. Ames)(Schmidt, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand and Request for Hearing and Oral Argument #15 [Defendant County of Lancaster's Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand] by Attorney Christopher M. Schmidt on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County.(Schmidt, Christopher) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend. As to all defendants, the brief in response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is due by June 1, 2021, with any reply due 7 days thereafter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Extend Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs' MOTION to Remand and Request for Hearing and Oral Argument #15 by Attorney Danielle L. Rowley on behalf of Defendants Leirion Gaylor Baird, Jeffrey Bliemeister, City of Lincoln, Patricia D. Lopez.(Rowley, Danielle) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend. Lancaster County's brief in response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand is due by June 1, 2021, with any reply due 7 days thereafter. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Leirion Gaylor Baird, Jeffrey Bliemeister, City of Lincoln, Patricia D. Lopez (Rowley, Danielle) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Extend (Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand) MOTION to Remand and Request for Hearing and Oral Argument #15 by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County.(Bottorf, Emily) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Lancaster County (Bottorf, Emily) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docket(#10) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Consent to Removal by Attorney Danielle L. Rowley on behalf of Defendants Leirion Gaylor Baird, Jeffrey Bliemeister, City of Lincoln, Patricia D. Lopez.(Rowley, Danielle) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County.(Bottorf, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 7) regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings)(Bottorf, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 6) regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings)(Bottorf, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 5) regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Pleadings)(Bottorf, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 4) regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Pleadings)(Bottorf, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 3) regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Pleadings)(Bottorf, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED (Attachment No. 2) regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 . by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Defendant Lancaster County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Pleadings)(Bottorf, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Benjamin Madsen, Madsen Bowling and Billiard Center from District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20 3282 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4375510) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Lancaster County (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Pleadings, #4 Exhibit Pleadings)(Bottorf, Emily) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lancaster County Attorney Office is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John L. Spray(Designation Retained)