This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/21/2022 at 08:19:57 (UTC).

Madore et al v. Simmons et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Madore filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Simmons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Bruce Howe Hendricks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-01974

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bruce Howe Hendricks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Matthew Madore

Mattie Madore

Defendants

William C Simmons

Federal Express Corporation

Federal Express Freight Inc.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lauren Heath Carroway

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan (HHI SC)

1544 Fording Island Road

Hilton Head Island, SC 29926

Defendant Attorneys

Aaron Jameson Hayes

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

Mark Steven Barrow

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29211

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court Documents

#2

(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Freight Inc., and William C Simmons. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Freight Inc., and William C Simmons. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#5

(#5) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/14/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/28/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 7/28/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/18/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/19/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/19/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/19/2022, Discovery due by 12/19/2022, Motions due by 1/18/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 4/18/2023, Mediation Due by 12/19/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/23/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#6

(#6) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 12/19/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/23/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Freight Inc.,, William C Simmons.(Hayes, Aaron) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/29/2022 with corrected ECF filer s/signature, and correct case number) (adic, ). (Entered: 06/24/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Supporting Documents

#10

(#10) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Freight Inc.,, William C Simmons.(Hayes, Aaron) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#11

(#11) AMENDED CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/18/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/19/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/19/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/19/2023, Discovery due by 3/19/2023, Motions due by 4/19/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 7/18/2023, Mediation Due by 3/19/2023, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/28/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#12

(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Matthew Madore. Service due by 11/14/2022 (Carroway, Lauren) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Discovery Request by Matthew Madore.(Carroway, Lauren) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

14 #14

Main Document

14 #1

Certificate of Service

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Interrogatories by Matthew Madore. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Carroway, Lauren) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE to Discovery Request by Matthew Madore.(Carroway, Lauren) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Matthew Madore. Service due by 11/14/2022 (Carroway, Lauren) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AMENDED CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/18/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/19/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/19/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/19/2023, Discovery due by 3/19/2023, Motions due by 4/19/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 7/18/2023, Mediation Due by 3/19/2023, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/28/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Freight Inc.,, William C Simmons.(Hayes, Aaron) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Jasper County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(Barrow, Mark) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Freight Inc.,, William C Simmons.(Hayes, Aaron) (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/29/2022 with corrected ECF filer s/signature, and correct case number) (adic, ). (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEDIATION ORDER: Mediation Due by 12/19/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/23/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/14/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/28/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 7/28/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/18/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/19/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/19/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/19/2022, Discovery due by 12/19/2022, Motions due by 1/18/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 4/18/2023, Mediation Due by 12/19/2022, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/23/2022. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Freight Inc., and William C Simmons. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Freight Inc., and William C Simmons. (adic, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas for Jasper County, case number 2022CP2700231. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10555349), filed by Federal Express Corporation, Federal Express Freight Inc., and William C Simmons. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (adic, ) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Express Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Steven Barrow