This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2021 at 12:17:23 (UTC).

Madkins v. City of Hobbs et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Madkins filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Hobbs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory B. Wormuth and Stephan M. Vidmar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01301

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory B. Wormuth

Presiding Judge

Stephan M. Vidmar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oliver Madkins

Defendants

Juan Jaimes

Ruben Gastelum

Dustin Seay

City of Hobbs

Kevin Martinez

David Torres

Joshua Gordon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Adam C. Flores

Attorney at Kennedy, Kennedy & Ives

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Efren Andres Cortez

Attorney at City of Hobbs

200 E. Broadway

Hobbs, NM 88240

Valerie S. Chacon

Attorney at City of Hobbs

200 E. Broadway

Hobbs, NM 88240

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. (ceo) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Recover Damages for Violations of Civil Rights by City of Hobbs. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Oliver Madkins.(Cortez, Efren) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by City of Hobbs Entry of Appearance of Valerie Chacon (Cortez, Efren) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) **FILED IN ERROR** NOTICE of Appearance by Efren Andres Cortez on behalf of City of Hobbs (Cortez, Efren) Modified on 2/1/2021 - filed in error per Efren Cortez (duplicate) (cmm). (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Efren Andres Cortez on behalf of City of Hobbs (Cortez, Efren) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Regarding Deadline to File Answer by City of Hobbs (Cortez, Efren) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Madkins. Joshua Gordon served on 1/23/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Madkins. Ruben Gastelum served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Madkins. Dustin Seay served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Kennedy, Joseph) Modified text to add dates on 1/25/2021 (nr). (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***FILED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Madkins. Dustin Seay served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Kennedy, Joseph) Modified text on 1/21/2021 add error language per attorney request. The document needs to be completed by process server and docket text is for a different defendant (gr). (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Madkins. David Torres served on 12/29/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Madkins. Juan Jaimes served on 12/29/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Oliver Madkins. City of Hobbs served on 12/29/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. (arp) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketOffice code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7455833 re #1 Complaint filed by Oliver Madkins (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT To Recover Damages for Violations of Civil Rights against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Oliver Madkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam C. Flores

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Kennedy