This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/01/2021 at 07:22:17 (UTC).

Madison Street Properties, LLC v. The Marcus Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 Madison Street Properties, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against The Marcus Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisa A. Jensen, Philip G. Reinhard and Iain D. Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-50471

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisa A. Jensen

Presiding Judges

Philip G. Reinhard

Iain D. Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Madison Street Properties, LLC

Defendant

The Marcus Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas J. Lester

Roger M Masson

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Thomas J. Lester of Change of Address for Appearance and request for Notice (Lester, Thomas) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above captioned case be reassigned to the calendar of Judge Iain D. Johnston. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/10/2020. (jp, ) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard: Judge Reinhard recuses himself in this case as he is well-acquainted with Peter Provenzano, the manager of the plaintiff, Madison Street Properties, LLC. This case is referred to the executive committee for reassignment. Emailed notice (sb, ) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Madison Street Properties, LLC by Roger M Masson (Masson, Roger) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen: The parties shall jointly complete the PDF fillable initial status report form found on Judge Jensen's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Initial Status Conferences and Reports and file by 2/4/2021. Plaintiff is directed to notify any party filing an appearance to the entry of this order. Mailed notice (jp, ) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by Madison Street Properties, LLC and Local Rule 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates (Lester, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Madison Street Properties, LLC by Thomas J. Lester (Lester, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lester, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard and Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Lisa Jensen. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pg, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT filed by Madison Street Properties, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17703840.(Lester, Thomas) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less