This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 14:56:54 (UTC).

Nakhle v. United States of America, et al.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 Nakhle filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia A. Gaughan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01470

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia A. Gaughan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Madison 89 Deli

Claude Nakhle

Claude Nakhle doing business as Madison 89 Deli

Defendants

United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jaye M. Schlachet

Attorney at Law Office of Jaye M. Schlachet and Eric Levy

55 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 8/28/2019 at 9:00 am to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/02/19. (D,Ma) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

3 #2

Magistrate Consent Form

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

2 #2

Summons Request for Service of Summon

2 #1

Summons Request for Service of Summon

#2

(#2) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Madison 89 Deli. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to US Attorney General, #2 Summons as to US Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service) (Schlachet, Jaye) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

1 #8

Designation Form Praecipe for Issuance

1 #6

Summons Summons US AG

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4 Proof of Delivery

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 Decision

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 Letter

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Letter

#1

(#1) Complaint for Judicial Review of Determination of U.S. Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service against Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9384243. Filed by Claude Nakhle. (Attachments: #1Exhibit 1 Letter of 3/6/19, #2 Exhibit 2 Letter of 3/20/19, #3 Exhibit 3 USDA Decision, #4 Exhibit 4 Proof of Delivery, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons US Attorney General, #7 Summons Food and Nutrition Service, #8 Praecipe for Issuance) (Schlachet, Jaye) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Service of Summons and Complaint Request for Service by the Clerk filed by Claude Nakhle. Related document(s) #2 , #1 , #3 .(Schlachet, Jaye) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketOrder [non-document] Case Management Conference of 8/28/19 has been continued to10/02/19 at 9:00 a.m. as Plaintiff has failed to perfect service. If service has not been perfected by the time allowed by law, case will be dismissed. Case Management Conference will be conducted by telephone with the Court initiating the call. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/22/19. (D,Ma) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 8/28/2019 at 9:00 am to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/02/19. (D,Ma) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Madison 89 Deli. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to US Attorney General, #2 Summons as to US Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service) (Schlachet, Jaye) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint for Judicial Review of Determination of U.S. Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service against Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9384243. Filed by Claude Nakhle. (Attachments: #1Exhibit 1 Letter of 3/6/19, #2 Exhibit 2 Letter of 3/20/19, #3 Exhibit 3 USDA Decision, #4 Exhibit 4 Proof of Delivery, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons US Attorney General, #7 Summons Food and Nutrition Service, #8 Praecipe for Issuance) (Schlachet, Jaye) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less