This case was last updated from PACER on 12/05/2019 at 05:30:43 (UTC).

Madho et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by Madho against Johnson Johnson in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-21062

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Persad Madho

Rita Madho

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN A. GOLDSTEIN

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

2500 Main Place Tower, 350 Main Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06437. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. Additionally, case is reassigned to Office Code 1: Brooklyn as per civil cover sheet Rule 50.1(d)(2). (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-12064340, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Rita Madho, Persad Madho. (Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 11/14/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Related Actions filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#9

(#9) Short Form Complaint by Persad Madho, Rita Madho. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-184: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Persad Madho, Rita Madho (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-184: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Short Form Complaint by Persad Madho, Rita Madho. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-06437. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Case transferred to District of New Jersey. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-184: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-184: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the District of New Jersey for the reasons stated in the order of October 4, 2016, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Freda L. Wolfson. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Related Actions filed by Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filed with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Florio, Lisa) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf for all further proceedings. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 11/15/2019. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. Additionally, case is reassigned to Office Code 1: Brooklyn as per civil cover sheet Rule 50.1(d)(2). (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Persad Madho, Rita Madho (Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., filing fee $400, receipt number ANYEDC-12064340, Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Rita Madho, Persad Madho. (Goldstein, Brian) Modified on 11/14/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.