This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2020 at 11:02:47 (UTC).

Madere v. Webre et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2020 Madere filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Webre. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Erin Wilder-Doomes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Erin Wilder-Doomes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trevor Madere

Defendants

Bobby Webre

Bryce carpenter

David Dykes

Ascension Parish

Jeffrey Rogillio

Livingston Alfred

John Doe 7

John Doe 3

John Doe 2

John Doe 6

XYZ Insurance Company

John Doe 5

John Doe 4

John Doe 1

ABC Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher James Murell

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

607 St. Charles Ave, Suite 300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Lance Covington Unglesby

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Adrian Michael Simm, Jr

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon St.

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Lewis Unglesby, Sr

Attorney at Unglesby Law Firm

246 Napoleon Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Ronald S. Haley, Jr.

8211 Goodwood Blvd, Suite E

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Defendant Attorney

James Bryan Mullaly

Attorney at Usry & Weeks, PLC

1615 Poydras St., Suite 1250

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Attachment civil cover sheet

1 #2

Attachment notice of lawsuit and waiver of summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Status Report FROM ALL PARTIES by Trevor Madere. (Murell, Christopher) Modified on 6/12/2020 to edit text (ELW). (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trevor Madere. Bobby Webre waiver sent on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Murell, Christopher) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trevor Madere. Jeffrey Rogillio waiver sent on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Murell, Christopher) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trevor Madere. David Dykes waiver sent on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Murell, Christopher) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trevor Madere. Bryce Carpenter waiver sent on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Murell, Christopher) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Trevor Madere. Livingston Alfred waiver sent on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Murell, Christopher) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 6/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/22/2020. (EDC) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2104018.), filed by Trevor Madere. (Attachments: #1 Attachment civil cover sheet, #2 Attachment notice of lawsuit and waiver of summons)(Murell, Christopher) (Attachment 1 and 2 replaced on 4/22/2020 to flatten documents) (SWE). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lewis O. Unglesby

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Covington Unglesby