This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2022 at 07:54:18 (UTC).

Maddy v. TP Apparel, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Maddy filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against TP Apparel, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04632

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica Maddy

Defendant

TP Apparel, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mars Khaimov

10826 64Th Avenue, Ste 2Nd Floor

Forest Hills, NY 11375

Defendant Attorney

Ernest Edward Badway

Attorney at Fox Rothschild, LLP (NYC)

101 Park Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10178

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against TP Apparel, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26236203)Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TP Apparel, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TP Apparel, LLC. (vf) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. TP Apparel, LLC served on 6/21/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. Service was accepted by Jerzy Shustin - CEO. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ernest Edward Badway on behalf of TP Apparel, LLC..(Badway, Ernest) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Redbubble Inc. for TP Apparel, LLC. Document filed by TP Apparel, LLC..(Badway, Ernest) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by TP Apparel, LLC..(Badway, Ernest) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on August 3, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/25/2022) (rro) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Supplement Joint Letter

#11

(#11) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Proposed Case Management Plan filed by Veronica Maddy. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of the parties' above joint letter and proposed case management plan. For the reasons stated above, the initial pretrial conference in this case is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. The Court will issue the parties' case management plan and a mediation referral order under separate cover. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/1/2022) (rro) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#12

(#12) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Fact Discovery due by 12/2/2022. All expert discovery, including reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions, shall be completed no later than 1/17/2023. Depositions of fact witnesses shall be completed by 11/14/2022. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and the present best estimate ofthe length of trial is 3 days. Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/1/2022) (rro) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#13

(#13) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER:It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/1/2022) (rro) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER:It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/11/2022. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/1/2022) (rro) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Fact Discovery due by 12/2/2022. All expert discovery, including reports, production of underlying documents, and depositions, shall be completed no later than 1/17/2023. Depositions of fact witnesses shall be completed by 11/14/2022. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and the present best estimate ofthe length of trial is 3 days. Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2022 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/1/2022) (rro) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Proposed Case Management Plan filed by Veronica Maddy. ENDORSEMENT: The Court is in receipt of the parties' above joint letter and proposed case management plan. For the reasons stated above, the initial pretrial conference in this case is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. The Court will issue the parties' case management plan and a mediation referral order under separate cover. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/1/2022) (rro) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Veronica Maddy. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Joint Letter).(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on August 3, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 8/3/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/25/2022) (rro) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by TP Apparel, LLC..(Badway, Ernest) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Redbubble Inc. for TP Apparel, LLC. Document filed by TP Apparel, LLC..(Badway, Ernest) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ernest Edward Badway on behalf of TP Apparel, LLC..(Badway, Ernest) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. TP Apparel, LLC served on 6/21/2022, answer due 7/12/2022. Service was accepted by Jerzy Shustin - CEO. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TP Apparel, LLC. (vf) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TP Apparel, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against TP Apparel, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26236203)Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TP Apparel, LLC d/b/a TeePublic is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest E. Badway