This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2022 at 09:58:45 (UTC).

Maddy v. Paper Source, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Maddy filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Paper Source, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05407

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica Maddy

Defendant

Paper Source, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mars Khaimov

10826 64Th Avenue, Ste 2Nd Floor

Forest Hills, NY 11375

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Paper Source, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26332884)Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paper Source, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paper Source, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Paper Source, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. Service was accepted by Mitchell Barczy. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconfenence number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Counsel for Plaintiffs is ordered to notify Defendant of this Notice. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/25/2022) (tg) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconfenence number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Counsel for Plaintiffs is ordered to notify Defendant of this Notice. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2022 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 8/25/2022) (tg) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Paper Source, Inc. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. Service was accepted by Mitchell Barczy. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paper Source, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paper Source, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Paper Source, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26332884)Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paper Source Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mars Khaimov