This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2022 at 08:35:05 (UTC).

Maddy v. Canal Furniture Corp.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Maddy filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Canal Furniture Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05342

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Veronica Maddy

Defendant

Canal Furniture Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mars Khaimov

10826 64Th Avenue, Ste 2Nd Floor

Forest Hills, NY 11375

Defendant Attorney

Joseph James DiPalma

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C. (WP)

44 South Broadway, 14Th Floor

White Plains, NY 10601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Canal Furniture Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26326967)Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Canal Furniture Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Canal Furniture Corp...(jgo) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 16, 2022, at 4:30 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/29/2022) (rro) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Canal Furniture Corp. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. Service was accepted by David Bab, sales person. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph James DiPalma on behalf of Canal Furniture Corp...(DiPalma, Joseph) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#8

(#8) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time - requesting a thirty-day extension of the August 22, 2022, deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint through, and including, September 21, 2022. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Joseph J. DiPalma dated August 18, 2022. Document filed by Canal Furniture Corp...(DiPalma, Joseph) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response to the complaint on or before September 21, 2022. Additionally, the initial pretrial conference is hereby ADJOURNED to September 28, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 8. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/19/2022) (ks) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Canal Furniture Corp. answer due 9/21/2022., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (ks) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response to the complaint on or before September 21, 2022. Additionally, the initial pretrial conference is hereby ADJOURNED to September 28, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 8. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/19/2022) (ks) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time - requesting a thirty-day extension of the August 22, 2022, deadline for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint through, and including, September 21, 2022. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Joseph J. DiPalma dated August 18, 2022. Document filed by Canal Furniture Corp...(DiPalma, Joseph) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph James DiPalma on behalf of Canal Furniture Corp...(DiPalma, Joseph) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Canal Furniture Corp. served on 8/1/2022, answer due 8/22/2022. Service was accepted by David Bab, sales person. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on September 16, 2022, at 4:30 p.m. The conference will be held telephonically. At the scheduled date and time, the parties are to call (888) 363-4749 and enter access code 5123533. Initial Conference set for 9/16/2022 at 04:30 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/29/2022) (rro) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Canal Furniture Corp...(jgo) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mars Khaimov. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Queens;. (jgo) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Canal Furniture Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Canal Furniture Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26326967)Document filed by Veronica Maddy..(Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph James DiPalma