This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:18:45 (UTC).

Maddox v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Maddox filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert C. Chambers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00871

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert C. Chambers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeff C. Maddox

Defendants

Transcanada Power Corp.

Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clayton J. Maddox

Attorney at GREENE KETCHUM FARRELL BAILEY & TWEEL

P. O. Box 2389

Huntington, WV 25724-2389

Jeremy M. McGraw

Attorney at BORDAS & BORDAS

1358 National Road

Wheeling, WV 26003

James G. Bordas, III

Attorney at BORDAS & BORDAS

1358 National Road

Wheeling, WV 26003

Defendant Attorneys

John Joseph Meadows

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

P. O. Box 1588

Charleston, WV 25326-1588

Devon J. Stewart

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

P. O. Box 1588

Charleston, WV 25326-1588

Peter J. Raupp

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

P. O. Box 1588

Charleston, WV 25326-1588

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER re: #5 JOINT MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp., Jeff C. Maddox to Consolidate Civil Actions; directing the cases listed herein consolidated; Civil Action No. 3:19-cv-0847 shall be designated as the lead case, and the matter shall proceed under that styling. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/10/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp., Jeff C. Maddox in support of #5 JOINT MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp., Jedd C. Maddox to Consolidate Civil Actions (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add party filer) (ts)

#5

(#5) JOINT MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp., Jedd C. Maddox to Consolidate Civil Actions (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add party filer) (ts).

#4

(#4) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp. (Raupp, Peter)

#3

(#3) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/24/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/6/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/13/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 1/27/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/3/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/6/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits A-B

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeff C. Maddox with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Wayne County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7478580. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (klc)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketTHIS CASE HAS BEEN CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE NUMBERS 3:19-cv-0847, 3:19-cv-0859, 3:19-cv-0860, 3:19-cv-0861, 3:19-cv-0862, 3:19-cv-0863, 3:19-cv-0864, 3:19-cv-0865, 3:19-cv-0866, 3:19-cv-0867, 3:19-cv-0868, 3:19-cv-0869, 3:19-cv-0870, 3:19-cv-0872, 3:19-cv-0873. ALL FURTHER ENTRIES SHALL BE DOCKETED IN 3:19-cv-0847. (mkw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re: #5 JOINT MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp., Jeff C. Maddox to Consolidate Civil Actions; directing the cases listed herein consolidated; Civil Action No. 3:19-cv-0847 shall be designated as the lead case, and the matter shall proceed under that styling. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/10/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp., Jeff C. Maddox in support of #5 JOINT MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp., Jedd C. Maddox to Consolidate Civil Actions (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add party filer) (ts)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT MOTION by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp., Jedd C. Maddox to Consolidate Civil Actions (Raupp, Peter) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add party filer) (ts).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Transcanada Power Corp. (Raupp, Peter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 12/24/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/6/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/13/2020. Scheduling/status Conference at 11:30 AM on 1/27/2020 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/3/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/6/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jeff C. Maddox with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Wayne County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7478580. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (klc)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.