This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/01/2021 at 20:01:12 (UTC).

Macquarie Energy LLC v. Mozart Wind LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Macquarie Energy LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mozart Wind LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jesse M. Furman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02435

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesse M. Furman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Macquarie Energy LLC

Defendants

Mozart Wind LLC

BayWa AG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark Howard Hatch-Miller

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP (NYC)

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019

Matthew David Wood

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P

1000 Louisiana, Ste Suire5100

Houston, TX 77002

Ashley McMillian

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana St., Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

William R. H. Merrill

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP (TX)

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Harold S. Shaftel

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Maura Eileen Miller

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#11

#12

#13

#14

#17

#18

#19

#20

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maura Eileen Miller on behalf of BayWa AG, Mozart Wind LLC..(Miller, Maura) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by BayWa AG..(Shaftel, Harold) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mozart Wind LLC..(Shaftel, Harold) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harold S. Shaftel on behalf of BayWa AG, Mozart Wind LLC..(Shaftel, Harold) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Matthew D. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jesse M. Furman)(Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Matthew D. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24340482. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Matthew D. Wood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24340482. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of MWood, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Wood, Matthew) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Hal S. Shaftel dated March 31, 2021. The Application is GRANTED. Each Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than May 17, 2021. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 13. SO ORDERED. BayWa AG answer due 5/17/2021; Mozart Wind LLC answer due 5/17/2021. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/31/2021) (ama) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Hal S. Shaftel dated March 31, 2021. Document filed by BayWa AG, Mozart Wind LLC..(Shaftel, Harold) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BayWa AG..(Shaftel, Harold) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on June 30, 2021 at 4:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Additionally, in accordance with Paragraph 2.B of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file on ECF a joint letter, described below, as well as a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order attached as an exhibit to the joint letter, no later than Thursday of the week prior to the initial pretrial conference. The parties shall use this Court's form Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, which is also available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. Counsel who have entered a notice of appearance as of the issuance of this order are directed (1) to notify counsel for all other parties in this action who have not yet appeared by serving upon each of them a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices forthwith, and (2) to file proof of such notice with the Court. If unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, counsel receiving this order must forthwith send a copy of this order and the Court's Individual Rules and Practices to that party personally. SO ORDERED. ( Initial Conference set for 6/30/2021 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/22/21) (yv) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BayWa AG, Mozart Wind LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mark Howard Hatch-Miller. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Macquarie Group Limited for Macquarie Energy LLC. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC..(Hatch-Miller, Mark) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hatch-Miller, Mark) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mozart Wind LLC and BayWa AG, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC..(Hatch-Miller, Mark) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BayWa AG, Mozart Wind LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24279926)Document filed by Macquarie Energy LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2).(Hatch-Miller, Mark) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harold S. Shaftel