This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2019 at 07:23:37 (UTC).

MacMann v. Tropicana Entertainment, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 MacMann filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Tropicana Entertainment, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney W. Sippel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00404

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney W. Sippel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Traci L. MacMann

Defendants

Tropicana St. Louis, LLC

120 South Central Avenue

Clayton, MO 63105

Tropicana Entertainment, Inc.

7701 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 500

Clayton, MO 63105

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George A. Hanson

Attorney at STUEVE AND SIEGEL, LLP

460 Nichols Rd., Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Ryan L. McClelland

Attorney at MCCLELLAND LAW FIRM, P.C.

200 Westwoods Drive, The Flagship Building

Liberty, MO 64068-1170

Alexander Thomas Ricke

Attorney at STUEVE AND SIEGEL, LLP

460 Nichols Rd., Suite 200

Kansas City, MO 64112

Michael James Rahmberg

Attorney at MCCLELLAND LAW FIRM

200 Westwoods Drive, The Flagship Building

Liberty, MO 64068-1170

Defendant Attorneys

Amanda E. Colvin

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP - ST. LOUIS

One Metropolitan Square, 211 N. Broadway, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Charles B. Jellinek

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP - ST. LOUIS

One Metropolitan Square, 211 N. Broadway, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Kathryn Palmer Scott

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP - ST. LOUIS

One Metropolitan Square, 211 N. Broadway, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Original Filing Form

1 #4

Summons Tropicana Entertainment, Inc.

1 #5

Summons Tropicana St. Louis, LLC

#1

(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., Tropicana St. Louis, LLC. (Colvin, Amanda) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann Process Server: HPS Process Service & Investigations (Hanson, George) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander Thomas Ricke for Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann. (Ricke, Alexander) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#4

(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan L. McClelland for Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann. (McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

21 #1

Exhibit A - Consents to Join

#20

(#20) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/13/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/20/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/15/19. (KEK) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 04/13/2019)

19 #1

Exhibit A - Consents to Join

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tropicana St. Louis, LLC.(Colvin, Amanda) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tropicana Entertainment, Inc..(Colvin, Amanda) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit A - Consents to Join

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/13/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 5/20/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Rodney W. Sippel. [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 4/15/19. (KEK) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 04/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tropicana St. Louis, LLC.(Colvin, Amanda) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tropicana Entertainment, Inc..(Colvin, Amanda) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ENTRY of Appearance by Kathryn Palmer Scott for Defendants Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., Tropicana St. Louis, LLC. (Scott, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ENTRY of Appearance by Charles B. Jellinek for Defendants Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., Tropicana St. Louis, LLC. (Jellinek, Charles) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Tropicana Entertainment, Inc. Tropicana St. Louis, LLC. (Colvin, Amanda) filed by Tropicana Entertainment, Inc. Tropicana St. Louis, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. [ANSWER NOW DUE ON OR BEFORE APRIL 10, 2019] Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/28/19. (KEK) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by Defendants Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., Tropicana St. Louis, LLC. (Colvin, Amanda) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE Filing Consents to Join: by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consents to Join)(McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Rahmberg. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7078953) by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rahmberg, Michael) filed by Traci L. MacMann; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 3/8/19. (KEK) (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Rahmberg. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-7078953) by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rahmberg, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan L. McClelland for Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann. (McClelland, Ryan) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander Thomas Ricke for Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann. (Ricke, Alexander) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to George A. Hanson. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (MFG) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Traci L. MacMann Process Server: HPS Process Service & Investigations (Hanson, George) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., Tropicana St. Louis, LLC with receipt number 0865-7072238, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Traci L. MacMann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons Tropicana Entertainment, Inc., #5 Summons Tropicana St. Louis, LLC)(Hanson, George) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.